This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/09/2019 at 00:15:10 (UTC).

JUANA MARIA ROMERO VS PROVIDENCE HOLY CROSS FOUNDATION ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/16/2018 a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice case was filed by JUANA MARIA ROMERO against PROVIDENCE HOLY CROSS FOUNDATION in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9856

  • Filing Date:

    01/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

LAURA A. SEIGLE

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

ROMERO JUANA MARIA

Defendants and Respondents

PROVIDENCE HOLY CROSS FOUNDATION

PERESS LEO M.D.

DOES 1 TO 100

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

7/2/2019: Minute Order

STATEMENT OF DAMAGES (PERSONAL INJURY OR WRONGFUL DEATH)

5/22/2018: STATEMENT OF DAMAGES (PERSONAL INJURY OR WRONGFUL DEATH)

SUMMONS

1/16/2018: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

1/16/2018: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/02/2019
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • STATEMENT OF DAMAGES (PERSONAL INJURY OR WRONGFUL DEATH)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death); Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by Juana Maria Romero (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC689856    Hearing Date: December 02, 2019    Dept: 4B

TENTATIVE] ORDER RE: DEFENDANT PROVIDENCE HOLY CROSS MEDICAL CENTER’S MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF’S RESPONSES TO DISCOVERY

On January 16, 2018, plaintiff Juana Maria Romero (“Plaintiff”) filed this action against defendants Providence Holy Cross Foundation (“Defendant”) and Leo Peress, M.D. On July 30, 2019, Defendant served Form Interrogatories, Set One, Special Interrogatories, Set One and Set Two, and Demand for Production of Documents, Set One. Plaintiff did not request an extension. After not receiving responses, defense counsel sent a meet and confer letter, but did not receive any response. Defendant seeks to compel Plaintiff’s responses to discovery.

Where a party fails to serve timely responses to discovery requests, the court may make an order compelling responses. (Code Civ. Proc., §§ 2030.290, 2031.300; Healthcare Consulting, Inc. v. Pacific Healthcare Consultants (2007) 148 Cal.App.4th 390, 403.) A party that fails to serve timely responses waives any objections to the request, including ones based on privilege or the protection of attorney work product. (Code Civ. Proc., §§ 2030.290, subd. (a), 2031.300, subd. (a).) Unlike a motion to compel further responses, a motion to compel responses is not subject to a 45-day time limit and the propounding party has no meet and confer obligations. (Sinaiko Healthcare Consulting, Inc., supra, 148 Cal.App.4th at p. 404.)

Plaintiff filed no opposition to these motions and did not serve responses to Defendant’s requests for discovery. However, the Court notes that only three filing fees were paid for the motions to compel responses to the four sets of discovery which should have been filed as four separate motions with four separate filing fees paid. Defendant is to pay one additional filing fee and file proof of payment. Subject to the filing of that additional fee, Defendant’s motions are GRANTED. Plaintiff is to serve verified responses, without objections, to Defendant’s Form Interrogatories, Set One, Special Interrogatories, Set One and Two, and Demand for Production of Documents, Set One within twenty (20) days of the date of the Order.

Moving party to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the Court at SSCDEPT4B@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative.