Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/12/2021 at 13:09:18 (UTC).

JUANA BAUTISTA, ET AL. VS KF RINALDI, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/16/2021 JUANA BAUTISTA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against KF RINALDI, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0206

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BAUTISTA MARIA

BAUTISTA JOSE

BAUTISTA JUANA

Defendants

CAMBRIDGE HEALTHCARE SERVICES LLC

ESTRADA JAVIER

KF RINALDI LLC DBA RINALDI CONVALESCENT HOSPITAL

LANEY ELISA

BAUTISTA DAVID

BAUTISTA JUAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

LANZONE ANTHONY CHRISTOPHER

 

Court Documents

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

4/5/2021: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

4/5/2021: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

4/5/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

4/5/2021: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

4/5/2021: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

3/18/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/16/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

3/16/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/16/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/16/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Declaration - DECLARATION OF MARIA BAUTISTA

3/16/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF MARIA BAUTISTA

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/17/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/17/2022
  • Hearing03/17/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department F47 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Juana Bautista (Plaintiff); Maria Bautista (Plaintiff); Jose Bautista (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Juana Bautista (Plaintiff); Maria Bautista (Plaintiff); Jose Bautista (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Juana Bautista (Plaintiff); Maria Bautista (Plaintiff); Jose Bautista (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Juana Bautista (Plaintiff); Maria Bautista (Plaintiff); Jose Bautista (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Juana Bautista (Plaintiff); Maria Bautista (Plaintiff); Jose Bautista (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Juana Bautista (Plaintiff); Maria Bautista (Plaintiff); Jose Bautista (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (of Maria Bautista); Filed by Juana Bautista (Plaintiff); Maria Bautista (Plaintiff); Jose Bautista (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Juana Bautista (Plaintiff); Maria Bautista (Plaintiff); Jose Bautista (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Juana Bautista (Plaintiff); Maria Bautista (Plaintiff); Jose Bautista (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Juana Bautista (Plaintiff); Maria Bautista (Plaintiff); Jose Bautista (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KF RINALDI LLC DBA RINALDI CONVALESCENT HOSPITAL is a litigant

Latest cases where CAMBRIDGE HEALTHCARE SERVICES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LANZONE ANTHONY C. ESQ.