This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/13/2023 at 03:26:12 (UTC).

JUAN V. GONZALEZ VS GARETT TABAREZ

Case Summary

On 03/17/2022 JUAN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against GONZALEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9450

  • Filing Date:

    03/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GONZALEZ JUAN V.

Defendant

TABAREZ GARETT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VALENCIA EVERARDO VARGAS

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

3/17/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: PERSONAL INJURY PROCEDURES

3/17/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: PERSONAL INJURY PROCEDURES

Unknown - SECOND AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL STANDING ORDER RE: COVID PROTECTIVE MEASURES RELATED TO FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

3/17/2022: Unknown - SECOND AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL STANDING ORDER RE: COVID PROTECTIVE MEASURES RELATED TO FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

3/17/2022: Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/17/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

3/17/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Complaint

3/17/2022: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/17/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/17/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

3/17/2022: Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/13/2025
  • Hearing03/13/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2023
  • Hearing09/14/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2023
  • Hearing08/31/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Juan V. Gonzalez (Plaintiff); As to: Garett Tabarez (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 08/31/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/14/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 03/13/2025 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Audra Mori in Department 31 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Juan V. Gonzalez (Plaintiff); As to: Garett Tabarez (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Juan V. Gonzalez (Plaintiff); As to: Garett Tabarez (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order re: Personal Injury Procedures; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketSecond Amended Supplemental Standing Order re: COVID Protective Measures Related to Final Status Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order re: Final Status Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketSixth Amended Standing Order re: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer VALENCIA EVERARDO VARGAS