This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/26/2021 at 01:31:35 (UTC).

JUAN SOTO VS AKG TRANS INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/22/2018 JUAN SOTO filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against AKG TRANS INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JON R. TAKASUGI, HOLLY E. KENDIG and THOMAS D. LONG. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1570

  • Filing Date:

    06/22/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

JON R. TAKASUGI

HOLLY E. KENDIG

THOMAS D. LONG

 

Party Details

Cross Defendants and Plaintiffs

SOTO JUAN

GABRIEL S.DHAKSHITHA PRAVIN

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

FLEMING KEVIN

A.K.G. TRANS INC.

GABRIEL F. DHAKSHITHA PRAVIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

MASTROIANNI A. DOUGLAS ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

BACH JACOB

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE VACATING FSC AND TRIAL DATE;) OF 04/01/2020

4/1/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE VACATING FSC AND TRIAL DATE;) OF 04/01/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE VACATING FSC AND TRIAL DATE;)

4/1/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE VACATING FSC AND TRIAL DATE;)

Order - Dismissal

8/31/2020: Order - Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

8/31/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [ORDER - DISMISSAL]

10/8/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [ORDER - DISMISSAL]

Order - Dismissal

5/13/2021: Order - Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE STATUS OF PL...)

5/13/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE STATUS OF PL...)

Notice of Ruling

6/4/2021: Notice of Ruling

Notice of Ruling

6/4/2021: Notice of Ruling

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC [AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES]

11/26/2019: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC [AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES]

Case Management Statement

11/26/2019: Case Management Statement

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE PLEADING AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO SERVE

5/24/2019: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE PLEADING AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO SERVE

Summons - Summons on Complaint

2/5/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Answer - ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

3/18/2019: Answer - ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS-COMPLAINT

3/19/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS-COMPLAINT

Cross-Complaint

3/19/2019: Cross-Complaint

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO SERVE)

5/20/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO SERVE)

Complaint -

6/22/2018: Complaint -

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (For Failure to Prosecute within 3yrs) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by A.K.G. Trans, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by A.K.G. Trans, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • Docketat 10:30 AM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (For Failure to Prosecute within 3yrs) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • Docketat 10:30 AM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Status of Plaintiff Obtaining New Counsel of Record) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • Docketat 10:30 AM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE STATUS OF PL...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketOrder - Dismissal; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketOrder - Dismissal; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([Order - Dismissal]); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by A.K.G. Trans, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • DocketEx Parte Application (Ex Parte Application for Extension of Time to Serve Pleading and Order extending time to Serve); Filed by A.K.G. Trans, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 3, Holly E. Kendig, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (order extending time to serve) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application order extending time to serve)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by A.K.G. Trans, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Cross-Complaint); Filed by A.K.G. Trans, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • DocketAnswer (to Complaint); Filed by A.K.G. Trans, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Juan Soto (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Juan Soto (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MASTROIANNI A. DOUGLAS ESQ.