Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/24/2021 at 13:39:15 (UTC).

JUAN RUIZ VS INTERMOUNTAIN LOCK & SECURITY SUPPLY, CO., A UTAH CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/24/2020 JUAN RUIZ filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against INTERMOUNTAIN LOCK SECURITY SUPPLY, CO , A UTAH CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID J. COWAN. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4011

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DAVID J. COWAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RUIZ JUAN

Defendants

DOE TY

INTERMOUNTAIN LOCK & SECURITY SUPPLY CO. A UTAH CORPORATION

PERKINS ROSS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SCHELLY THOMAS HENRY

SCHELLY THOMAS H.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

8/25/2020: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

7/6/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice of Case Management Conference

7/2/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

7/2/2020: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/24/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/24/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/24/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

6/24/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/04/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 20, David J. Cowan, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 20, David J. Cowan, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (With Prejudice); Filed by JUAN RUIZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by JUAN RUIZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by JUAN RUIZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by JUAN RUIZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by JUAN RUIZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where INTERMOUNTAIN LOCK AND SECURITY CO. INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHELLY THOMAS H.