This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/07/2022 at 09:31:22 (UTC).

JUAN REYES VS FORD MOTOR COMPANY

Case Summary

On 08/10/2022 JUAN REYES filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against FORD MOTOR COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0689

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

REYES JUAN

Defendant

FORD MOTOR COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STEWARD JOSEPH

 

Court Documents

Complaint

8/10/2022: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/10/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/10/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/10/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/10/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Personal Service

8/25/2022: Proof of Personal Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/12/2022
  • Hearing12/12/2022 at 1:30 PM in Department F at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Juan Reyes (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Juan Reyes (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Juan Reyes (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Juan Reyes (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ford Motor Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer STEWARD JOSEPH