This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/10/2022 at 01:23:55 (UTC).

JUAN RAMIREZ VS CALIFORNIA HOTEL HOSPITALITY SERVICES, INC., A CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/14/2021 JUAN RAMIREZ filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against CALIFORNIA HOTEL HOSPITALITY SERVICES, INC , A CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BARBARA M. SCHEPER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2051

  • Filing Date:

    06/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BARBARA M. SCHEPER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RAMIREZ JUAN

Defendants

CALIFORNIA HOTEL HOSPITALITY SERVICES INC. A CORPORATION

TRINET HR XI INC. A CORPORATION

CALIFORNIA HOTEL HOSPITALITY SERVICES INC.

TRINET HR XI INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GUTIERREZ MATTHEW ESQ.

GUTIERREZ MATTHEW

 

Court Documents

Complaint

6/14/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/14/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/14/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/14/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/17/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

8/18/2021: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

Case Management Statement

10/28/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

10/27/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

10/27/2021: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

11/1/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND (PROPOSED) ORDER TO STAY LITIGATION PROCEEDINGS

10/31/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND (PROPOSED) ORDER TO STAY LITIGATION PROCEEDINGS

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/04/2022
  • Hearing04/04/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 30, Barbara M. Scheper, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • Docketat 4:20 PM in Department 30, Barbara M. Scheper, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order (Stipulation and Order to Stay Litigation Proceedings); Filed by Juan Ramirez (Plaintiff); CALIFORNIA HOTEL HOSPITALITY SERVICES, INC. (Defendant); TRINET HR XI, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by CALIFORNIA HOTEL HOSPITALITY SERVICES, INC. (Defendant); TRINET HR XI, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Matthew Gutierrez, Esq. (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Juan Ramirez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketAmended Complaint ( (1st)); Filed by Juan Ramirez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Juan Ramirez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Juan Ramirez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Juan Ramirez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TRINET HR XI, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where CALIFORNIA HOTEL HOSPITALITY SERVICES INC. A CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GUTIERREZ MATTHEW