This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/20/2022 at 15:09:42 (UTC).

JUAN PABLO RAMOS CAZARES, ET AL. VS AMAZON, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/27/2022 JUAN PABLO RAMOS CAZARES, filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against AMAZON,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1086

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RAMOS CAZARES JUAN PABLO

RAMOS JUAN PABLO JR.

Defendants

AMAZON

AMAZON.COM SERVICES LLC

DEEGAN EXPRESS

DOES 1 TO 100

EAN HOLDINGS LLC DBA ENTERPRISE-RENT-A-CAR

ENTERPRISE RENT-A-CAR COMPANY OF LOS ANGELES LLC

LIBATIQUE RICHARD VINCENT ILAN

MARTINEZ ONTIME PARCEL INC.

RIVERA HERNANDEZ DANIEL

SOLIS EMANUEL JONATAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GEOULLA DANIEL DANNY

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/27/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

10/27/2022: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/27/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/27/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/27/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Order to Show Cause (Hearing)

11/3/2022: Order to Show Cause (Hearing)

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/3/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/31/2023
  • Hearing05/31/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department B at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service, Failure to Prosecute, Failure to File Case Management Conference Statement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • Hearing05/31/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department B at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Gary Y. Tanaka in Department B Torrance Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service, Failure to Prosecute, Failure to File Case Management Conference Statement scheduled for 05/31/2023 at 08:30 AM in Torrance Courthouse at Department B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause (Hearing); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 05/31/2023 at 08:30 AM in Torrance Courthouse at Department B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Juan Pablo Ramos Cazares (Plaintiff); Juan Pablo Ramos, Jr. (Plaintiff); As to: Amazon (Defendant); Amazon.com Services LLC (Defendant); Deegan Express (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Juan Pablo Ramos Cazares (Plaintiff); Juan Pablo Ramos, Jr. (Plaintiff); As to: Amazon (Defendant); Amazon.com Services LLC (Defendant); Deegan Express (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Juan Pablo Ramos Cazares (Plaintiff); Juan Pablo Ramos, Jr. (Plaintiff); As to: Amazon (Defendant); Amazon.com Services LLC (Defendant); Deegan Express (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Juan Pablo Ramos Cazares (Plaintiff); Juan Pablo Ramos, Jr. (Plaintiff); As to: Amazon (Defendant); Amazon.com Services LLC (Defendant); Deegan Express (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DEEGAN EXPRESS is a litigant

Latest cases where MARTINEZ ONTIME PARCEL INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where AMAZON INC is a litigant

Latest cases where AMAZON.COM SERVICES LLC is a litigant