This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/28/2022 at 05:39:33 (UTC).

JUAN MURILLO VS GONI ENTERPRISES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/15/2021 JUAN MURILLO filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against GONI ENTERPRISES, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0038

  • Filing Date:

    01/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MURILLO JUAN

Defendants

GONI ENTERPRISES INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA SAIGON MARKET

CELFIO GONI AN INDIVIDUAL

NORMA GONI AN INDIVIDUAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GOSE TIARA

Defendant Attorney

THOMPSON DEAN GREGORY

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

2/16/2022: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE; TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

11/2/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE; TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

11/2/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

5/19/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

5/25/2021: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)

5/27/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

4/26/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Answer

4/26/2021: Answer

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT AND ORDER

4/20/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT AND ORDER

Unknown - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

4/23/2021: Unknown - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

3/22/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

3/22/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

3/22/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

Declaration re: Due Diligence

2/11/2021: Declaration re: Due Diligence

Declaration re: Due Diligence

2/11/2021: Declaration re: Due Diligence

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/11/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/11/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/11/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/16/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by JUAN MURILLO (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department B; Status Conference - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department B; Trial Setting Conference - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by JUAN MURILLO (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference; Trial Setting Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department B; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • Docketat 12:00 PM in Department B; Non-Appearance Case Review (Re585 Default Judgment Package) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department B; Status Conference - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by GONI ENTERPRISES, INC., a California Corporation (Defendant); CELFIO GONI, an Individual (Defendant); NORMA GONI, an Individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketDeclaration re: Due Diligence; Filed by JUAN MURILLO (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by JUAN MURILLO (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by JUAN MURILLO (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketAmended Summons on Complaint; Filed by JUAN MURILLO (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by JUAN MURILLO (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by JUAN MURILLO (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by JUAN MURILLO (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer THOMPSON DEAN GREGORY ESQ.