This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/22/2021 at 18:40:30 (UTC).

JUAN MANUEL CHAVEZ VS THE BICYCLE CASINO COMMUNITY FOUNDATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/16/2020 JUAN MANUEL CHAVEZ filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against THE BICYCLE CASINO COMMUNITY FOUNDATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MAUREEN DUFFY-LEWIS, BARBARA A. MEIERS and JON R. TAKASUGI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5373

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MAUREEN DUFFY-LEWIS

BARBARA A. MEIERS

JON R. TAKASUGI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHAVEZ JUAN MANUEL

Defendants

GOMEZ FERNANDO

THE BICYCLE CASINO COMMUNITY FOUNDATION AKA THE BICYCLE HOTEL & CASINO A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

GARCIA FERNANDO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SCHELLY THOMAS H

SCHELLY THOMAS HENRY

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement

3/29/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

4/1/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

2/24/2021: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

3/12/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

11/13/2020: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Motion to Compel Arbitration

11/13/2020: Motion to Compel Arbitration

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

11/2/2020: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER) OF 11/03/2020

11/3/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER) OF 11/03/2020

Notice of Rejection - Pleadings

10/26/2020: Notice of Rejection - Pleadings

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/2/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

9/23/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

9/24/2020: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

9/24/2020: Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE;)

9/24/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE;)

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/17/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/16/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/16/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

9/16/2020: Complaint

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2022
  • Hearing04/20/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 17 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Post-Arbitration Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 17, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 17, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order (Joint Stipulation Submitting Case to Binding Arbitration and Staying Judicial Proceedings; [proposed] Order Thereon); Filed by THE BICYCLE CASINO COMMUNITY FOUNDATION (Defendant); Fernando Gomez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by THE BICYCLE CASINO COMMUNITY FOUNDATION (Defendant); Fernando Gomez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 17, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Juan Manuel Chavez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketNotice (NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE); Filed by Juan Manuel Chavez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by Juan Manuel Chavez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re: Peremptory Challenge;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Peremptory Challenge;) of 09/24/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Juan Manuel Chavez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Juan Manuel Chavez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Juan Manuel Chavez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Juan Manuel Chavez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BICYCLE HOTEL AND CASINO is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHELLY THOMAS H.