This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/02/2019 at 05:08:17 (UTC).

JUAN MANUAL SANCHEZ VS MARVIN S HARRIS ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/23/2017 JUAN MANUAL SANCHEZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MARVIN S HARRIS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3491

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SANCHEZ JUAN MANUAL

Defendants

AVIS ENTERPRISES INC

AVIS BUDGET GROUP INC

BYRNE MARY

HARRIS MARVIN S.

BUDGET RENT A CAR SYSTEM INC.

BUDGET RENT A CAR SYSTEMS INC. DOE 6

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BIEDERMAN MARC

Defendant Attorney

KRUPPE MICHAEL A. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Request for Judicial Notice

11/2/2018: Request for Judicial Notice

Declaration

11/2/2018: Declaration

Declaration

11/2/2018: Declaration

Motion for Summary Judgment

11/2/2018: Motion for Summary Judgment

Motion to Deem RFA"s Admitted

12/28/2018: Motion to Deem RFA"s Admitted

Minute Order

1/23/2019: Minute Order

Notice of Ruling

1/23/2019: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order

2/6/2019: Minute Order

Minute Order

2/25/2019: Minute Order

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/27/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Demand for Jury Trial

3/29/2019: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer

3/29/2019: Answer

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

9/18/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

9/19/2017: DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

9/19/2017: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

9/25/2017: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

SUMMONS

8/23/2017: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

8/23/2017: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by MARY BYRNE (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by MARY BYRNE (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by JUAN MANUAL SANCHEZ (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Jury Trial)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • DocketJudgment; Filed by Budget Rent a Car System, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Held - Motion Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 09/25/2017
  • DocketAMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • DocketDEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Budget Rent a Car System, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Budget Rent a Car System, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by JUAN MANUAL SANCHEZ (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by JUAN MANUAL SANCHEZ (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****3491    Hearing Date: January 17, 2020    Dept: 32

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 5

JUAN MANUAL SANCHEZ,

Plaintiff,

v.

MARVIN S. HARRIS, et al.,

Defendants.

Case No.: ****3491

Hearing Date: January 17, 2020

[Tentative] order RE:

DEFENDANT MARY BYRNE’S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

On August 23, 2017, Plaintiff Juan Manual Sanchez (“Plaintiff”) filed this action against Defendant Mary Byrne (“Defendant”), among others, following a motor vehicle collision. Now, Defendant moves for summary judgment, which Plaintiff does not oppose. Defendant relies on her own declaration, which states that she was not involved in the accident. (Declaration of Mary Byrne, ¶ 3.) Defendant’s declaration states that she was neither the driver nor the occupant of any vehicle involved in the accident and was not at or near the scene of the accident. (Ibid.) Her declaration also states that although she once rented the vehicle involved in the accident, she did not have possession on the date of the accident, as she had previously returned the vehicle to the rental car business. (Id., ¶ 6.) Finally, Defendant states that she did not lend the vehicle to the driver, co-defendant Marvin Harris. (Id., ¶ 4.) This is sufficient to satisfy Defendant’s burden, and Plaintiff neither opposes the motion nor proffers any evidence to create a triable issue. Therefore, Defendant’s motion for summary judgment is granted. Defendant shall provide notice and file proof of such with the Court.

DATED: January 17, 2020 ___________________________

Hon. Stephen I. Goorvitch

Judge of the Superior Court



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AVIS ENTERPRISES INC is a litigant

Latest cases where BUDGET RENT A CAR SYSTEM INC. A CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where AVIS / BUDGET GROUP INC A CORPORATION is a litigant