This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/04/2021 at 20:05:17 (UTC).

JUAN MACHUCA VS JOSE GUADALUPE BUGARIN PEREZ

Case Summary

On 06/30/2021 JUAN MACHUCA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JOSE GUADALUPE BUGARIN PEREZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4144

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MACHUCA JUAN

Defendant

BUGARIN PEREZ JOSE GUADALUPE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SUBLETTE CAMM

Defendant Attorney

ELDRIDGE SHAWN S.

 

Court Documents

Demand for Jury Trial

8/17/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer

8/17/2021: Answer

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

7/12/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

PI General Order

7/12/2021: PI General Order

Proof of Personal Service

7/20/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/30/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/30/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/30/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

6/30/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/26/2024
  • Hearing06/26/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • Hearing12/28/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • Hearing12/14/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Jose Guadalupe Bugarin Perez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Jose Guadalupe Bugarin Perez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Juan Machuca (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Juan Machuca (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Juan Machuca (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Juan Machuca (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SUBLETTE CAMM