This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/29/2022 at 16:43:08 (UTC).

JUAN HERNANDEZ ORTEGA, VS CARENET LA. INC.

Case Summary

On 09/29/2022 JUAN HERNANDEZ ORTEGA, filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against CARENET LA INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III and DAVID J. COWAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1959

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III

DAVID J. COWAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HERNANDEZ ORTEGA JUAN

Defendant

CARENET LA. INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MAHONEY KEVIN

Defendant Attorney

SARGOY KENNETH J

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

9/29/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

9/29/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/29/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

9/29/2022: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/29/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

9/29/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE. NON-COMPLEX DETERMINATION;) OF 10/12/2022

10/12/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE. NON-COMPLEX DETERMINATION;) OF 10/12/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE. NON-COMPLEX DETERMINATION;)

10/12/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE. NON-COMPLEX DETERMINATION;)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE REASSIGNMENT TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT) OF 10/18/2022

10/18/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE REASSIGNMENT TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT) OF 10/18/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE REASSIGNMENT TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT)

10/18/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE REASSIGNMENT TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT)

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/20/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

11/16/2022: Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Case Management Statement

11/22/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

11/28/2022: Case Management Statement

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/08/2022
  • Hearing12/08/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department B at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: CareNet LA. Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: Juan Hernandez Ortega, (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by: Juan Hernandez Ortega, (Plaintiff); As to: CareNet LA. Inc. (Defendant); Service Date: 11/06/2022; Service Cost: 104.30; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 12/08/2022 at 08:30 AM in Torrance Courthouse at Department B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketCase reassigned to Torrance Courthouse in Department B - Hon. Gary Y. Tanaka; Reason: Other

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order Re Reassignment to an Independent Calendar Court)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re Reassignment to an Independent Calendar Court) of 10/18/2022; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Deemed Complex

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 10/12/2022
  • DocketThe case is removed from the special status of: Stay - Deemed Complex

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • DocketThe case is removed from the special status of: Deemed Complex

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketCase assigned in Department 11 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Juan Hernandez Ortega, (Plaintiff); As to: CareNet LA. Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Juan Hernandez Ortega, (Plaintiff); As to: CareNet LA. Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Juan Hernandez Ortega, (Plaintiff); As to: CareNet LA. Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Provisionally Complex Case Type

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MAHONEY KEVIN