This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/30/2019 at 05:34:10 (UTC).

JUAN HARO VS LGI ASSOCIATION INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/18/2017 JUAN HARO filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against LGI ASSOCIATION INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MARC MARMARO and TERESA A. BEAUDET. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8986

  • Filing Date:

    07/18/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MARC MARMARO

TERESA A. BEAUDET

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

HARO JUAN

Respondents, Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

LGI ASSOCIATION INC

CHIU JOHN C.

DOES 1 TO 50

YOUABIAN SHARONA

KARANDISH SAEID

Respondents, Defendants and Cross Defendants

CHIU JOHN C.

PJCF-T2 LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

MAHONEY KEVIN ESQ.

ALIAZIS DIONISIOS ESQ.

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

KIMBALL TIREY & ST. JOHN LLP

SCHLECHT KARL PATRICK

Cross Plaintiff Attorney

CAWLFIELD CRAIG OWEN

 

Court Documents

DEI?END6NT .JONN C. CHIU?S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF?S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

1/8/2018: DEI?END6NT .JONN C. CHIU?S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF?S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

2/13/2018: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

2/13/2018: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

2/15/2018: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

Minute Order

2/23/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

2/23/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

3/6/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

3/22/2018: Minute Order

SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. FAILURE TO PAY MINIMUM WAGE; ETC.

4/20/2018: SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. FAILURE TO PAY MINIMUM WAGE; ETC.

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

5/23/2018: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

5/23/2018: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER

6/11/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER

Minute Order

6/11/2018: Minute Order

DEFENDANT'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

7/13/2018: DEFENDANT'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

Unknown

7/13/2018: Unknown

CROSS-COMPLAINT OF DEFENDANTS LGI ASSOCIATION INC SAEID KARANDISH AND SHARONA YOUABIAN FOR;

7/13/2018: CROSS-COMPLAINT OF DEFENDANTS LGI ASSOCIATION INC SAEID KARANDISH AND SHARONA YOUABIAN FOR;

Unknown

7/16/2018: Unknown

Unknown

7/18/2018: Unknown

41 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 50, Teresa A. Beaudet, Presiding; Status Conference - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • Docketat 4:13 PM in Department 50, Teresa A. Beaudet, Presiding; Nunc Pro Tunc Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of 04/12/2019); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 50, Teresa A. Beaudet, Presiding; Status Conference - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 50, Teresa A. Beaudet, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ((Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • DocketAnswer ([Defendant John C. Chiu's] To Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint); Filed by John C. Chiu (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
107 More Docket Entries
  • 08/30/2017
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by John C. Chiu (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • DocketNotice of Related Cases

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Juan Haro (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF DEPOSIT OF JURY FEES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • DocketNotice; Filed by Juan Haro (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. FAILURE TO PAY MINIMUM WAGE; ETC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • DocketCIVIL DEPOSIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Juan Haro (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PJCF-T2 LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where LGI ASSOCIATION INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CAWLFIELD CRAIG OWEN