This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/19/2019 at 08:27:14 (UTC).

JUAN GONZALEZ VS QUE SKYSPACE LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/04/2017 JUAN GONZALEZ filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against QUE SKYSPACE LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CHRISTOPHER K. LUI. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6405

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CHRISTOPHER K. LUI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

GONZALEZ JUAN

Defendants, Respondents and Not Classified By Court

QUE SKYSPACE LLC

LEGENDS HOSPITALITY LLC

TWT INC.

BERINGIA CENTRAL LLC

LEGENDS ATTRACTIONS LLC

DOE 2

DOE 1

DOE 5

DOES 2

DOE 4

TWT GROUP THE

DOE 6

DOES 7 THROUGH 50

DOE 3

OUE SKYSPACE LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

NOVACK BARRY

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

ELLROD ANTHONY J. ESQ.

GRGURIC SHERRY L. ESQ.

WILSON MICHAEL B. ESQ.

CARTER COREY

GRGURIC SHERRY LYNN

ELLROD ANTHONY JAMES

Other Attorneys

CARTER COREY ALAN

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

10/22/2019: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE)

9/30/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE)

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF SAMUEL WINOKUR, ESQ.; EXHIBITS 1-2

8/6/2019: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF SAMUEL WINOKUR, ESQ.; EXHIBITS 1-2

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF SAMUEL WINOKUR

7/10/2019: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF SAMUEL WINOKUR

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF MOTION & MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 4, MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF SAMUEL WINOKUR

7/11/2019: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF MOTION & MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 4, MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF SAMUEL WINOKUR

Notice of Ruling

6/18/2019: Notice of Ruling

Reply - REPLY REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL SECOND PHYSICAL EXAMINATION OF PLAINTIFF JUAN GONZALEZ

6/6/2019: Reply - REPLY REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL SECOND PHYSICAL EXAMINATION OF PLAINTIFF JUAN GONZALEZ

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (EX PARTE APPLICATION OF DEFENDANTS QUE SKYSPACE LLC AND BERIN...)

4/8/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (EX PARTE APPLICATION OF DEFENDANTS QUE SKYSPACE LLC AND BERIN...)

Ex Parte Application - Ex Parte Application to continue trial

1/24/2019: Ex Parte Application - Ex Parte Application to continue trial

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to continue trial filed by de...)

1/24/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to continue trial filed by de...)

Request for Dismissal

12/28/2018: Request for Dismissal

Ex Parte Application - Ex Parte Application for determination of good faith settlement

12/10/2018: Ex Parte Application - Ex Parte Application for determination of good faith settlement

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY -

8/21/2018: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY -

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT AS BETWEEN PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT TWT INC. DBA THE TWT GROUP.

9/4/2018: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT AS BETWEEN PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT TWT INC. DBA THE TWT GROUP.

APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT AS BETWEEN PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT TWT INC.;AND ETC.

9/4/2018: APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT AS BETWEEN PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT TWT INC.;AND ETC.

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

8/8/2018: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

PROOF OF SERVICE RE: 1. NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT, ETC

8/8/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE RE: 1. NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT, ETC

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR PERSONAL INJURIES

4/4/2017: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR PERSONAL INJURIES

51 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Juan Gonzalez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • DocketNotice (Notice of OSC re Dismissal); Filed by Juan Gonzalez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • Docketat 4:30 PM in Department 4A, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re: Notice of Settlement of Entire Case)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Juan Gonzalez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Notice of Settlement of Entire Case) of 09/30/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 4A, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (To Continue Trial) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 4A, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • DocketNotice (Plaintiff's Notice of Trial Continuance); Filed by Juan Gonzalez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 4A, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
82 More Docket Entries
  • 05/10/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Juan Gonzalez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Juan Gonzalez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Juan Gonzalez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR PERSONAL INJURIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Juan Gonzalez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where QUE SKYSPACE LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where TWT, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where BERINGIA CENTRAL LLC is a litigant