This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/03/2022 at 11:22:04 (UTC).

JUAN FLORES MARQUEZ VS JONATHAN BERNARD LUNA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/29/2021 JUAN FLORES MARQUEZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JONATHAN BERNARD LUNA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are AUDRA MORI and CHARLES C. LEE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1979

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

AUDRA MORI

CHARLES C. LEE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

FLORES MARQUEZ JUAN

UNITED WISCONSIN INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

IRISH CONSTRUCTION

LUNA JONATHAN BERNARD

MANHATTAN CAPITAL CORPORATION

Not Classified By Court and Plaintiff

UNITED WISCONSIN INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Not Classified By Court Attorneys

ARSHAKYAN TINA ESQ.

LUCIANO SAERIM

Defendant Attorney

CRANERT TERRENCE L.

 

Court Documents

Answer - ANSWER TO COMPLAINT-IN-INTERVENTION

8/18/2021: Answer - ANSWER TO COMPLAINT-IN-INTERVENTION

Notice of Ruling

7/22/2021: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE)

7/22/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE)

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT IN INTERVENTION

7/22/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT IN INTERVENTION

Complaint in Intervention

7/22/2021: Complaint in Intervention

Civil Case Cover Sheet - CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET AMENDED

4/7/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET AMENDED

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/7/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

4/7/2021: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

Proof of Personal Service

4/14/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

4/14/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

4/14/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Lien

4/15/2021: Notice of Lien

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

4/15/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

4/15/2021: PI General Order

Motion for Leave to Intervene

4/22/2021: Motion for Leave to Intervene

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

5/21/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

5/21/2021: Answer

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/29/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2024
  • Hearing03/25/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • Hearing09/26/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • Hearing09/12/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketAnswer (to Complaint-In-Intervention); Filed by JONATHAN BERNARD LUNA (Defendant); IRISH CONSTRUCTION (Defendant); MANHATTAN CAPITAL CORPORATION (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 31, Audra Mori, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Leave to Intervene - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketComplaint in Intervention; Filed by UNITED WISCONSIN INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff in Intervention)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketSummons (ON COMPLAINT IN INTERVENTION); Filed by UNITED WISCONSIN INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff in Intervention)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by UNITED WISCONSIN INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff in Intervention)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Leave to Intervene)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by JONATHAN BERNARD LUNA (Defendant); IRISH CONSTRUCTION (Defendant); MANHATTAN CAPITAL CORPORATION (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by JUAN FLORES MARQUEZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by JUAN FLORES MARQUEZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by JUAN FLORES MARQUEZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (AMENDED); Filed by JUAN FLORES MARQUEZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by JUAN FLORES MARQUEZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketAmended Complaint ( (1st)); Filed by JUAN FLORES MARQUEZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by JUAN FLORES MARQUEZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by JUAN FLORES MARQUEZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by JUAN FLORES MARQUEZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: *******1979 Hearing Date: July 22, 2021 Dept: 31

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

JUAN FLORES MARQUEZ,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

JONATHAN BERNARD LUNA, ET AL.,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

CASE NO: *******1979

[TENTATIVE] ORDER GRANTING INTERVENER’S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE

Dept. 31

8:30 a.m.

July 22, 2021

Plaintiff, Juan Flores Marquez (“Plaintiff”) filed this action against Defendants, Johnson & Johnson, Inc. for damages arising from a motor vehicle accident.

United Wisconsin Insurance Company, administered by Next Level Administrators (“United”) moves for leave to intervene in this action. United contends Plaintiff, at the time of the incident, was in the course and scope of his employment with United’s insured. United asserts Plaintiff made a workers’ compensation claim for the subject injuries, and United, as the workers’ compensation insurance carrier, paid benefits on the claim.

Labor Code ;; 3852 and 3853 make clear that an employer against whom a claim for worker’s compensation damages was made may join in an action against a third party arising out of the incident for which the worker’s compensation payment was made. ; 3850(b) defines “employer” to include the employer’s insurer.

The motion is unopposed and granted. Intervener is ordered to file a separate copy of the complaint-in-intervention within five days.

Intervener is ordered to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the court at sscdept31@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org. If the department does not receive an email indicating the parties are submitting on the tentative and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion may be placed off calendar. If a party submits on the tentative, the party’s email must include the case number and must identify the party submitting on the tentative. If the parties do not submit on the tentative, they should arrange to appear remotely.

Dated this 22nd day of July, 2021

Hon. Charles Lee

Judge of the Superior Court


related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MANHATTAN CAPITAL CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where UNITED WISCONSIN INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where IRISH CONSTRUCTION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LUCIANO SAERIM