This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/15/2019 at 01:18:37 (UTC).

JUAN ESPEJO MONTANO VS DE WELL LOGISTICS LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/14/2018 JUAN ESPEJO MONTANO filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against DE WELL LOGISTICS LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9924

  • Filing Date:

    06/14/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

MONTANO JUAN ESPEJO

Respondents and Defendants

DE WELL GROUP LLC

DOES 1 TO 25

DE WELL CONTAINER SHIPPING INC.

DE WELL LOGISTICS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF DANIEL J. O'NEIL-ORTIZ

O'NEIL-ORTIZ DANIEL

O'NEIL-ORTIZ DANIEL JORGE

Defendant Attorneys

KING & SPALDING LLP

SABNIS CHERYL ANN

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

6/14/2018: COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

7/2/2018: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

DEFENDANTS' ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

7/17/2018: DEFENDANTS' ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

7/10/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

7/10/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

7/10/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

Case Management Statement

10/25/2018: Case Management Statement

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

9/18/2018: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

8/23/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

Request for Dismissal

3/22/2019: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Settlement

3/21/2019: Notice of Settlement

Minute Order

2/25/2019: Minute Order

Minute Order

11/6/2018: Minute Order

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

6/14/2018: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2019
  • at 09:00 AM in Department 19; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by De Well Logistics LLC (Defendant); De Well Group LLC (Defendant); De Well Container Shipping, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Juan Espejo Montano (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • Notice of Settlement; Filed by Juan Espejo Montano (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 19; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 19; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • Minute Order ((Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • Case Management Statement; Filed by Juan Espejo Montano (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Juan Espejo Montano (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 07/10/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Juan Espejo Montano (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Juan Espejo Montano (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by Juan Espejo Montano (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • Summons; Filed by Juan Espejo Montano (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where De Well Container Shipping, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where DE WELL GROUP LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where DE WELL LOGISTICS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer O'NEIL-ORTIZ DANIEL