This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/20/2021 at 18:39:08 (UTC).

JUAN DOMINGUEZ GONZALEZ, ET AL. VS MIRIAN ELIZABETH PEREZ COLINDRES, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/21/2020 JUAN DOMINGUEZ GONZALEZ filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MIRIAN ELIZABETH PEREZ COLINDRES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are DAVID J. COWAN, EDWARD B. MORETON and EDWARD B. MORETON, JR.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7324

  • Filing Date:

    07/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

DAVID J. COWAN

EDWARD B. MORETON

EDWARD B. MORETON, JR.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LOPEZ ORTIZ CRISTINA

DOMINGUEZ GONZALEZ JUAN

Cross Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Defendants

MORALES HELEN

AUGUSTO MORALES CESAR

PEREZ COLINDRES MIRIAN ELIZABETH

PEREZ REINA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SOLMER LILIT

Cross Defendant, Cross Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

KWAK JOHN JIWOONG

TUSA DAN

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

6/7/2021: Request for Dismissal

Offer to Compromise and Acceptance Under Code of Civil Procedure Section 998

5/11/2021: Offer to Compromise and Acceptance Under Code of Civil Procedure Section 998

Offer to Compromise and Acceptance Under Code of Civil Procedure Section 998

5/11/2021: Offer to Compromise and Acceptance Under Code of Civil Procedure Section 998

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: RECUSAL) OF 03/02/2021

3/2/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: RECUSAL) OF 03/02/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: RECUSAL)

3/2/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: RECUSAL)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE REASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO A RECUSAL)

3/8/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE REASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO A RECUSAL)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE REASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO A RECUSAL) OF 03/08/2021

3/8/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE REASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO A RECUSAL) OF 03/08/2021

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

3/16/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

11/13/2020: Answer

Answer

11/13/2020: Answer

Answer

9/24/2020: Answer

Demand for Jury Trial

9/24/2020: Demand for Jury Trial

Demand for Jury Trial

9/25/2020: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer

9/25/2020: Answer

Cross-Complaint

9/25/2020: Cross-Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/25/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Cross-Complaint

9/25/2020: Cross-Complaint

Proof of Personal Service

9/29/2020: Proof of Personal Service

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/18/2023
  • Hearing07/18/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • Hearing01/18/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • Hearing01/04/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Juan Dominguez Gonzalez (Plaintiff); Cristina Lopez Ortiz (Plaintiff); Mirian Elizabeth Perez Colindres (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketOffer to Compromise and Acceptance Under Code of Civil Procedure Section 998; Filed by Cesar Augusto Morales (Defendant); Helen Morales (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketOffer to Compromise and Acceptance Under Code of Civil Procedure Section 998; Filed by Cesar Augusto Morales (Defendant); Helen Morales (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Mirian Elizabeth Perez Colindres (Defendant); Reina Perez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • Docketat 10:30 AM in Department 1, David J. Cowan, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Reassignment Pursuant to a Recusal) of 03/08/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re Reassignment Pursuant to a Recusal)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Mirian Elizabeth Perez Colindres (Defendant); Reina Perez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Mirian Elizabeth Perez Colindres (Defendant); Reina Perez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Juan Dominguez Gonzalez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Juan Dominguez Gonzalez (Plaintiff); Cristina Lopez Ortiz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Juan Dominguez Gonzalez (Plaintiff); Cristina Lopez Ortiz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SOLMER LILIT