Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/10/2021 at 02:48:12 (UTC).

JUAN DIEGO LARA VS MAXIMILIANO HP, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/29/2020 JUAN DIEGO LARA filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against MAXIMILIANO HP, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are WILLIAM F. FAHEY and TIMOTHY PATRICK DILLON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6432

  • Filing Date:

    04/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

WILLIAM F. FAHEY

TIMOTHY PATRICK DILLON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LARA JUAN DIEGO

Defendants

GUERRERO ANDRE

MAXIMILIANO HP INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

LAST NAME UNKNOWN RUBEN

LAST NAME UNKNOWN CHUCK

LAST NAME UNKNOWN LEO

LAST NAME UNKNOWN RODRIGO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PAIRAVI EDWIN

Defendant Attorney

SPITZER GARY STEVEN

 

Court Documents

Offer to Compromise and Acceptance Under Code of Civil Procedure Section 998

6/14/2021: Offer to Compromise and Acceptance Under Code of Civil Procedure Section 998

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

3/26/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSES

4/22/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSES

Separate Statement

4/22/2021: Separate Statement

Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

4/22/2021: Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE APRIL 28, 2021 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

4/27/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE APRIL 28, 2021 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE APRIL 28, 2021...) OF 04/27/2021

4/27/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE APRIL 28, 2021...) OF 04/27/2021

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

1/19/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE; C...)

1/28/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE; C...)

Case Management Statement

10/23/2020: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE; C...)

10/30/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE; C...)

Notice - NOTICE CASE REASSIGNMENT

8/17/2020: Notice - NOTICE CASE REASSIGNMENT

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

8/17/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

8/28/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

4/30/2020: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER;)

5/5/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER;)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER;) OF 05/05/2020

5/5/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER;) OF 05/05/2020

Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

5/5/2020: Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/02/2022
  • Hearing05/02/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 73 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • Hearing04/18/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 73 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • Hearing08/04/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 73 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • Hearing07/23/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 73 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • Hearing07/23/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 73 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketOffer to Compromise and Acceptance Under Code of Civil Procedure Section 998; Filed by Juan Diego Lara (Plaintiff); Maximiliano HP, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant); Andre Guerrero (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 73, Timothy Patrick Dillon, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • Docketat 4:30 PM in Department 73, Timothy Patrick Dillon, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Joint Stipulation to Continue April 28, 2021...) of 04/27/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re: Joint Stipulation to Continue April 28, 2021...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • Docketat 3:17 PM in Department 69, William F. Fahey, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ((Court Order re: peremptory challenge to judicial officer;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: peremptory challenge to judicial officer;) of 05/05/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by Juan Diego Lara (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Juan Diego Lara (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Juan Diego Lara (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Juan Diego Lara (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Spitzer, Gary S