This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/26/2021 at 19:23:32 (UTC).

JUAN CARRILLO, ET AL. VS BAYER CONSUMER CARE HOLDINGS LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On September 30, 2021, Juan Carrillo and Oralia Carrillo (collectively, “Plaintiffs”), represented by Luong Karen, Maki Craig R. and Oganesyan Albert, filed a personal injury lawsuit for asbestos product liability against Bayer Consumer Care Holdings LLC F/K/A Bayer Consumer Care LLC F/K/A MSD Consumer Care, Inc.); Bayer Healthcare LLC, a Subsidiary of Bayer AG et al (“Defendants”), seeking general and punitive damages, costs, and other relief for alleged injuries and damages caused due to exposure to asbestos from Defendants’ raw asbestos fiber. This case was filed in the United States District Court in the California - Los Angeles County Superior Courts in Spring Street Courthouse.

 

Plaintiffs are informed and believe, and thereon allege, that each Defendant designated herein as a DOE is allegedly responsible, negligently or in some other actionable manner, for the events and happenings hereinafter referred to, and caused injuries and damages proximately thereby to the Plaintiffs as hereinafter alleged.

 

In the complaint, Plaintiffs alleged that, “Defendants’ Products were used at all times in a manner that was reasonably foreseeable to Defendants, their “alternate entities”, and each of them, thereby rendering Defendants’ Products unsafe and dangerous for use by “exposed persons”. Plaintiffs herein allege that Plaintiff Juan Carrillo’s exposures to Defendants’ Products including, but not limited to, those products identified in paragraph 3 above, were a substantial contributing factor in the development of his mesothelioma and therefore proximately caused Plaintiff’s illnesses, injuries, disabilities, and damages.”

 

Plaintiffs also alleged that, “As a direct and proximate result of the conduct of the Defendants, their “alternate entities”, and each of them as aforesaid, Plaintiff Juan Carrillo’s exposures to asbestos from personally using, working with and around others using Defendant’s Products while in close proximity to Plaintiff, caused severe and permanent injury to the Plaintiff.”

 

Further, Plaintiffs alleged that, “As a direct and proximate result of the aforesaid conduct of Defendants, their “alternate entities” and each of them, Plaintiff Juan Carrillo has suffered and will continue to suffer pain, discomfort, loss of weight, loss of appetite, fatigue, somnolence, lethargy, dyspnea, dysphagia, and other physical symptoms, and the mental and emotional distress attendant thereto, as Plaintiff’s malignant mesothelioma progresses, all to his general damage in a sum in excess of the jurisdictional limits of a limited civil case.”

 

There are four claims for relief laid down by Plaintiffs. The first claim for relief is for negligence. The second claim for relief is for strict liability. The third claim for relief is for fraud and the fourth claim for relief is for loss of consortium.

 

In the prayer for relief, Plaintiffs have requested the court to pass a judgment for general damages together with exemplary or punitive damages, including medical and related expenses, damages for loss of consortium, and/or society according to proof. Further, Plaintiffs requested the court for an award of costs and further relief as the court may deem just and proper including costs and prejudgment interest as provided in C.C.P. section 998, C.C.P. section 1032, and related provisions of law. 

 

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6036

  • Filing Date:

    09/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STUART M. RICE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CARRILLO JUAN

CARRILLO ORALIA

Defendants

BAYER CONSUMER CARE HOLDINGS LLC FKA BAYER CONSUMER CARE LLC F/K/A/ MSD CONSUMER CARE INC.

BAYER HEALTHCARE LLC

CALAVERAS ASBESTOS LTD.

CUSTOM BUILDING PRODUCTS LLC

DAP PRODUCTS INC.

DR. SCHOLL'S LLC

HENRY COMPANY LLC

HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC. FKA ALLIED-SIGNAL INC. SUED AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO BENDIX CORPORATION

MERCK & CO. INC.

MISSION STUCCO CO. FKA MISSION STUCCO COMPANY INC.

PFIZER INC.

SCHOLL'S WELLNESS COMPANY LLC

THE PEP BOYS - MANNY MOE & JACK OF CALIFORNIA LLC

THE SHERWIN-WILLIAMS CO.

UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION

VANDERBILT MINERALS LLC

W.W. HENRY COMPANY

WHITTAKER CLARK & DANIELS INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

OGANESYAN ALBERT

Defendant Attorneys

BAIME COLLEEN ELIZABETH

BRAY KENDRA ELYSE

GARRATT JUSTIN EDWARD

HUIE JEREMY D.

KAPLAN BRADLEY P.

LUONG KAREN

MAKI CRAIG R

NICHOLS STEPHEN M.

TABUENA CYRIAN BARRACA

REJCH BARTEK R.

SHARP GARY D.

SPANGLER KHARE VIIU

 

Court Documents

Answer - ANSWER OF DEFENDANT, UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION, TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR PERSONAL INJURY

11/3/2021: Answer - ANSWER OF DEFENDANT, UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION, TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR PERSONAL INJURY

Answer - ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY - ASBESTOS

11/3/2021: Answer - ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY - ASBESTOS

Answer - ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY -ASBESTOS

11/4/2021: Answer - ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY -ASBESTOS

Answer - ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY - ASBESTOS

11/4/2021: Answer - ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY - ASBESTOS

Answer - ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

11/4/2021: Answer - ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

Answer - ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' CLASS COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY

11/4/2021: Answer - ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' CLASS COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY

Answer - ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY ASBESTOS

11/5/2021: Answer - ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY ASBESTOS

Answer - ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY - ASBESTOS

11/5/2021: Answer - ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY - ASBESTOS

Answer - ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY AND LOSS OF CONSORTIUM - ASBESTOS

11/5/2021: Answer - ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY AND LOSS OF CONSORTIUM - ASBESTOS

Answer - ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY - ASBESTOS

11/5/2021: Answer - ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY - ASBESTOS

Answer - DEFENDANT DAP, INC. K/N/A LA MIRADA PRODUCTS CO., INC.'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT

11/8/2021: Answer - DEFENDANT DAP, INC. K/N/A LA MIRADA PRODUCTS CO., INC.'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT

Answer

11/16/2021: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

11/16/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE SIMON GREENSTONE PANATIER PC)

11/18/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE SIMON GREENSTONE PANATIER PC)

Answer

10/20/2021: Answer

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

10/21/2021: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Answer - ANSWER OF DEFENDANT THE PEP BOYS -MANNY, MOE, & JACK OF CALIFORNIA TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY- ASBESTOS

10/18/2021: Answer - ANSWER OF DEFENDANT THE PEP BOYS -MANNY, MOE, & JACK OF CALIFORNIA TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY- ASBESTOS

Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE SUMMONS DR. SCHOLL'S LLC

10/14/2021: Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE SUMMONS DR. SCHOLL'S LLC

32 More Documents Available
View All Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/24/2023
  • Hearing07/24/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department 15 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2023
  • Hearing07/10/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department 15 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • Docketat 1:45 PM in Department 15, Stuart M. Rice, Presiding; Initial Status Conference ((CARRILLO-21STCV36036))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference Re Simon Greenstone Panatier PC)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Honeywell International, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Honeywell International, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketDefendant Dap, Inc. k/n/a La Mirada Products Co., Inc.'s Answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint; Filed by DAP, Inc. k/n/a La Mirada Products Co., Inc. Erroneously Sued As Dap Products, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketAnswer (To Plaintiffs' Complaint For Personal Injury - Asbestos); Filed by W.W. Henry Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketAnswer (To Plaintiff's Complaint For Personal Injury ? Asbestos); Filed by Calaveras Asbestos, Ltd. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketAnswer (to Plaintiffs complaint For Personal Injury - Asbestos); Filed by W.W. Henry Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service (Summons Bayer Healthcare LLC); Filed by Juan Carrillo (Plaintiff); Oralia Carrillo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection of Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) (to Vendor); Filed by Juan Carrillo (Plaintiff); Oralia Carrillo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Juan Carrillo (Plaintiff); Oralia Carrillo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Juan Carrillo (Plaintiff); Oralia Carrillo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Juan Carrillo (Plaintiff); Oralia Carrillo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Juan Carrillo (Plaintiff); Oralia Carrillo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Juan Carrillo (Plaintiff); Oralia Carrillo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DR. SCHOLL'S LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where BAYER CONSUMER CARE HOLDINGS LLC, F/K/A BAYER CONSUMER CARE LLC F/K/A MSD CONSUMER CARE, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where CUSTOM BUILDING PRODUCTS LLC A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where MERCK & CO. INC. is a litigant