Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/24/2019 at 00:25:37 (UTC).

JUAN BERNARDINO VS GIOVANNI D'AMORE ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/08/2018 JUAN BERNARDINO filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against GIOVANNI D'AMORE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9743

  • Filing Date:

    06/08/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

BERNARDINO JUAN

Defendants and Respondents

D'AMORE GIOVANNI

THE MONARCH FAMILY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

DOES 1 THROUGH 10 INCLUSIVE

INCOME ESTATES LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

LOMBARDO CATHERINE

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

11/20/2019: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

11/22/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Civil Case Cover Sheet - /Coversheet

6/8/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet - /Coversheet

Summons -

6/8/2018: Summons -

Complaint -

6/8/2018: Complaint -

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/22/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Juan Bernardino (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet /Coversheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Juan Bernardino (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Juan Bernardino (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MONARCH FAMILY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP A is a litigant

Latest cases where INCOME ESTATES LLC is a litigant