This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/08/2019 at 03:12:25 (UTC).

JUAN BERNAL VS GUSTAVO PRIETO ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/09/2017 JUAN BERNAL filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GUSTAVO PRIETO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JON R. TAKASUGI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1826

  • Filing Date:

    08/09/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JON R. TAKASUGI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

BERNAL JUAN

Defendants and Respondents

ATT SERVICES

DOES 1 TO 20

PRIETO GUSTAVO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

NEHORAY & DRAKE LLP

NEHORAY SIAMAK EBRAHIM ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

1/23/2019: Minute Order

Minute Order

2/11/2019: Minute Order

Unknown

4/9/2019: Unknown

Summons

4/9/2019: Summons

SUMMONS

8/9/2017: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES -PERSONAL INJURY -NEGLIGENCE -PROPERTY DAMAGE

8/9/2017: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES -PERSONAL INJURY -NEGLIGENCE -PROPERTY DAMAGE

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/09/2019
  • Complaint (1st); Filed by Juan Bernal (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • Amended Complaint (1st); Filed by Juan Bernal (Plaintiff); Juan Bernal (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • Summons (on 1st Amended Complaint); Filed by Juan Bernal (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Non-Jury Trial)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by Juan Bernal (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES -PERSONAL INJURY -NEGLIGENCE -PROPERTY DAMAGE

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC671826    Hearing Date: February 11, 2020    Dept: 31

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

JUAN BERNAL,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

GUSTAVO PRIETO, ET AL.,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

CASE NO: BC671826

[TENTATIVE] ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT’S UNOPPOSED MOTIONS TO COMPEL AND MOTION TO DEEM RFAS ADMITTED

Dept. 31

1:30 p.m.

February 11, 2020

Defendant, AT&T Services, Inc. propounded special interrogatories, form interrogatories, RFAs, and RPDs on Plaintiff on 9/25/19. To date, despite multiple meet and confer efforts, Plaintiff has not served responses. Defendant therefore seeks an order compelling Plaintiff to respond, without objections, to the outstanding interrogatories and RPDs, deeming the RFAs admitted, and imposing sanctions.

Defendant’s motions to compel are granted. Plaintiff is ordered to serve verified responses to form interrogatories, special interrogatories, and RPDs, without objections, within ten days. CCP §§2030.290(a),(b), 2031.300(a),(b).

Defendant’s motion to deem RFAs admitted is also granted. CCP §2033.280(b).

Sanctions are mandatory. §§2030.290(c), 2031.300(c), 2033.280(c). Defendant seeks sanctions in the amount of $847.50/motion. Defense Counsel bills at the rate of $175/hour. The Court awards one hour to prepare each form discovery motion. No opposition was filed and therefore no reply was necessary. The Court awards the requested 1.5 hours of time to appear, but only awards the time once. The Court therefore awards a total of 5.5 hours of attorney time at the requested rate of $175/hour, or $962.50 in attorneys’ fees. The Court also awards the requested $240 in costs.

Sanctions are sought and imposed against Plaintiff and his attorney of record, jointly and severally; they are ordered to pay sanctions to Moving Defendant, by and through its attorney of record, in the total amount of $1202.50, within twenty days.

Moving Defendant is ordered to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the court at sscdept31@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.  If the department does not receive an email indicating the parties are submitting on the tentative and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion may be placed off calendar. If a party submits on the tentative, the party’s email must include the case number and must identify the party submitting on the tentative.