This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/31/2023 at 13:14:04 (UTC).

JUAN ANTONIO ALONZO ALBANEZ VS HARDWOOD RESTAURANT HOLDINGS, LLC

Case Summary

On 12/19/2022 JUAN ANTONIO ALONZO ALBANEZ filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against HARDWOOD RESTAURANT HOLDINGS, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MAREN NELSON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9279

  • Filing Date:

    12/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MAREN NELSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALBANEZ JUAN ANTONIO ALONZO

Defendant

HARDWOOD RESTAURANT HOLDINGS LLC DBA MAPLE BLOCK MEAT CO.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

COX HEATHER K.

WONG GREGORY PHILIP

Defendant Attorneys

CARYL JESSE M.

CARVER JENNIFER ANN

 

Court Documents

Amended Complaint - FIRST AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT

5/24/2023: Amended Complaint - FIRST AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND ORDER ALLOWING PLAINTIFF TO FILE A FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

5/19/2023: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND ORDER ALLOWING PLAINTIFF TO FILE A FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Notice of Ruling - PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF RULING AT INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE

4/25/2023: Notice of Ruling - PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF RULING AT INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Answer

4/24/2023: Answer

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

3/24/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Status Conference Statement - STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT JOINT INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE CLASS ACTION STATEMENT

3/17/2023: Status Conference Statement - STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT JOINT INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE CLASS ACTION STATEMENT

Notice - NOTICE OF COURT ORDER AND INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE

2/6/2023: Notice - NOTICE OF COURT ORDER AND INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Notice of Appearance

2/3/2023: Notice of Appearance

Initial Status Conference Order

1/12/2023: Initial Status Conference Order

Initial Status Conference Order

1/12/2023: Initial Status Conference Order

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: COMPLEX DESIGNATION)

1/12/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: COMPLEX DESIGNATION)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: COMPLEX DESIGNATION) OF 01/12/2023, INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE

1/12/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: COMPLEX DESIGNATION) OF 01/12/2023, INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE SUMMONS

1/10/2023: Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE SUMMONS

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

12/19/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

12/19/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

12/19/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/19/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/19/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/30/2023
  • Hearing10/30/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 17 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion for Class Certification

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2023
  • Hearing07/25/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department 17 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Further Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketFirst Amended Class Action Complaint; Filed by: Juan Antonio Alonzo Albanez (Plaintiff); As to: Hardwood Restaurant Holdings, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • DocketStipulation and Order Stipulation And Order Allowing Plaintiff To File A First Amended Complaint; Signed and Filed by: Juan Antonio Alonzo Albanez (Plaintiff); As to: Hardwood Restaurant Holdings, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • DocketPlaintiff's Notice of Ruling at Initial Status Conference; Filed by: Juan Antonio Alonzo Albanez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Hardwood Restaurant Holdings, LLC (Defendant); As to: Juan Antonio Alonzo Albanez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Jesse M. Caryl (Attorney): Organization Name changed from BENT CARYL & KROLL, LLP to Bent Caryl & Kroll, LLP; Middle Name changed from M to M.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2023
  • DocketAddress for Jesse M. Caryl (Attorney) customer request

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • DocketHearing on Motion for Class Certification scheduled for 10/30/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 17

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • DocketFurther Status Conference scheduled for 07/25/2023 at 09:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 17

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Maren Nelson in Department 17 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Juan Antonio Alonzo Albanez (Plaintiff); As to: Hardwood Restaurant Holdings, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Juan Antonio Alonzo Albanez (Plaintiff); As to: Hardwood Restaurant Holdings, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Juan Antonio Alonzo Albanez (Plaintiff); As to: Hardwood Restaurant Holdings, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Class Action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Provisionally Complex Case Type

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less