This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/16/2023 at 11:26:11 (UTC).

JUAN ANTONIO ALONZO ALBANEZ VS HARDWOOD RESTAURANT HOLDINGS, LLC

Case Summary

On 12/19/2022 JUAN ANTONIO ALONZO ALBANEZ filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against HARDWOOD RESTAURANT HOLDINGS, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MAREN NELSON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9279

  • Filing Date:

    12/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MAREN NELSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALBANEZ JUAN ANTONIO ALONZO

Defendant

HARDWOOD RESTAURANT HOLDINGS LLC DBA MAPLE BLOCK MEAT CO.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

COX HEATHER K.

WONG GREGORY PHILIP

Defendant Attorneys

CARVER JENNIFER ANN

CARYL JESSE M.

 

Court Documents

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE CLASS CERTIFICATION HEARING AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE

8/16/2023: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE CLASS CERTIFICATION HEARING AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

7/25/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

Status Conference Statement - JOINT STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT

7/18/2023: Status Conference Statement - JOINT STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT

Answer - DEFENDANTS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

6/1/2023: Answer - DEFENDANTS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER - CONFIDENTIAL DESIGNATION ONLY

6/1/2023: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER - CONFIDENTIAL DESIGNATION ONLY

Amended Complaint - FIRST AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT

5/24/2023: Amended Complaint - FIRST AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND ORDER ALLOWING PLAINTIFF TO FILE A FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

5/19/2023: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND ORDER ALLOWING PLAINTIFF TO FILE A FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Notice of Ruling - PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF RULING AT INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE

4/25/2023: Notice of Ruling - PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF RULING AT INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Answer

4/24/2023: Answer

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

3/24/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Status Conference Statement - STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT JOINT INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE CLASS ACTION STATEMENT

3/17/2023: Status Conference Statement - STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT JOINT INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE CLASS ACTION STATEMENT

Notice - NOTICE OF COURT ORDER AND INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE

2/6/2023: Notice - NOTICE OF COURT ORDER AND INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Notice of Appearance

2/3/2023: Notice of Appearance

Initial Status Conference Order

1/12/2023: Initial Status Conference Order

Initial Status Conference Order

1/12/2023: Initial Status Conference Order

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: COMPLEX DESIGNATION)

1/12/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: COMPLEX DESIGNATION)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: COMPLEX DESIGNATION) OF 01/12/2023, INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE

1/12/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: COMPLEX DESIGNATION) OF 01/12/2023, INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE SUMMONS

1/10/2023: Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE SUMMONS

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/26/2024
  • Hearing02/26/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department 17 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion for Class Certification

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2023
  • DocketPursuant to written stipulation, Hearing on Motion for Class Certification scheduled for 10/30/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 17 Not Held - Continued - Stipulation was rescheduled to 02/26/2024 10:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Stipulation and Order Joint Stipulation and Order to Continue Class Certification Hearing and Briefing Schedule: Status Date changed from 08/16/2023 to 08/16/2023 ; Filed By: Juan Antonio Alonzo Albanez (Plaintiff); Result: Entered ; Name Extension changed from Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Continue Class Certification Hearing and Briefing Schedule to Joint Stipulation and Order to Continue Class Certification Hearing and Briefing Schedule ; Result Date: 08/16/2023 ; As To Parties changed from Hardwood Restaurant Holdings, LLC (Defendant) to Hardwood Restaurant Holdings, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2023
  • DocketStipulation and Order Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Continue Class Certification Hearing and Briefing Schedule; Signed and Filed by: Juan Antonio Alonzo Albanez (Plaintiff); As to: Hardwood Restaurant Holdings, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Further Status Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2023
  • DocketFurther Status Conference scheduled for 07/25/2023 at 09:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 17 updated: Result Date to 07/25/2023; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2023
  • DocketJoint Status Conference Statement; Filed by: Juan Antonio Alonzo Albanez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • DocketDefendants Answer to Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint for Damages; Filed by: Hardwood Restaurant Holdings, LLC (Defendant); As to: Juan Antonio Alonzo Albanez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Stipulation and Protective Order - Confidential Designation Only: Status Date changed from 06/01/2023 to 06/01/2023 ; Filed By: Juan Antonio Alonzo Albanez (Plaintiff); Result: Entered ; Exact Name changed from Stipulation and [Proposed] Protective Order - Confidential Designation Only to Stipulation and Protective Order - Confidential Designation Only ; Result Date: 06/01/2023 ; As To Parties changed from Hardwood Restaurant Holdings, LLC (Defendant) to Hardwood Restaurant Holdings, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • DocketStipulation and [Proposed] Protective Order - Confidential Designation Only; Signed and Filed by: Juan Antonio Alonzo Albanez (Plaintiff); As to: Hardwood Restaurant Holdings, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Maren Nelson in Department 17 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Juan Antonio Alonzo Albanez (Plaintiff); As to: Hardwood Restaurant Holdings, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Juan Antonio Alonzo Albanez (Plaintiff); As to: Hardwood Restaurant Holdings, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Juan Antonio Alonzo Albanez (Plaintiff); As to: Hardwood Restaurant Holdings, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Class Action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Provisionally Complex Case Type

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less