This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/15/2022 at 11:19:01 (UTC).

JUAN ALVAREZ VS WASTE MANAGEMENT HOLDINGS, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/17/2021 JUAN ALVAREZ filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against WASTE MANAGEMENT HOLDINGS, INC , A DELAWARE CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5918

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALVAREZ JUAN

Defendants

RINKENBERGER LARRY

USA WASTE OF CALIFORNIA INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

WASTE MANAGEMENT HOLDINGS INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

USA WASTE OF CALIFORNIA INC.

WASTE MANAGEMENT HOLDINGS INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ELIHU KAVEH S.

CASTRO MATIAS N.

ELIHU KAVEH SAM

Defendant Attorney

MUSSIG ROBERT EUGENE

 

Court Documents

Complaint

12/17/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/17/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/17/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/17/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Answer

3/4/2022: Answer

Answer

3/4/2022: Answer

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/24/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

2/22/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 02/22/2022

2/22/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 02/22/2022

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

2/22/2022: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

Proof of Personal Service

2/22/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

1/26/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

1/19/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

1/12/2022: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/6/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/29/2022
  • Hearing06/29/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 38 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 34; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by USA Waste of California, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Waste Management Holdings, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • Docketat 4:18 PM in Department 34; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Juan Alvarez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 02/22/2022); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by Waste Management Holdings, Inc. (Defendant); USA Waste of California, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Juan Alvarez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Juan Alvarez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Kaveh S. Elihu (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Juan Alvarez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Juan Alvarez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Juan Alvarez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WASTE MANAGEMENT, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where USA WASTE OF CALIFORNIA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mussig, Robert Eugene