Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/24/2021 at 10:08:50 (UTC).

JUAN ALBERTO MARTINEZ, AN INDIVIDUAL VS SCOTT ALEXANDER SEIDMAN, AN INDIVIDUAL

Case Summary

On 03/15/2021 JUAN ALBERTO MARTINEZ, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SCOTT ALEXANDER SEIDMAN, AN INDIVIDUAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9958

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARTINEZ AN INDIVIDUAL JUAN ALBERTO

Defendant

SEIDMAN AN INDIVIDUAL SCOTT ALEXANDER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AZIZI DANIEL

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

4/6/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

4/6/2021: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/15/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/15/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/15/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

3/15/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2024
  • Hearing03/11/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • Hearing09/12/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • Hearing08/29/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by JUAN ALBERTO MARTINEZ, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by JUAN ALBERTO MARTINEZ, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by JUAN ALBERTO MARTINEZ, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less