This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/13/2021 at 03:48:51 (UTC).

JSL PLAZA PUENTE HILLS, LLC VS SHENG JIAN XU, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/10/2020 JSL PLAZA PUENTE HILLS, LLC filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against SHENG JIAN XU. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is PETER A. HERNANDEZ. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0196

  • Filing Date:

    03/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Pomona Courthouse South

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

PETER A. HERNANDEZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JSL PLAZA PUENTE HILLS LLC

Defendants

XU SHENG JIAN

CHEN ZHI JIAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JUNG HAROLD

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: RE: WHY CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED ...)

1/11/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: RE: WHY CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED ...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

10/13/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 10/13/2020

10/13/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 10/13/2020

Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

9/1/2020: Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

9/1/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Writ of Execution - WRIT OF EXECUTION (LOS ANGELES )

9/2/2020: Writ of Execution - WRIT OF EXECUTION (LOS ANGELES )

Application for Issuance of Writ of Execution, Possession or Sale

9/2/2020: Application for Issuance of Writ of Execution, Possession or Sale

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

6/3/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

5/12/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Proof of Personal Service

3/18/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

3/12/2020: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (SHENG JIAN XU)

3/12/2020: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (SHENG JIAN XU)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (ZHI JIAN CHEN)

3/12/2020: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (ZHI JIAN CHEN)

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/10/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

3/10/2020: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/10/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

3/11/2020: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/11/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/11/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department O, Peter A. Hernandez, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (ReWhy Case Should not be Dismissed for Attorney's Failure to Appear) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause Re: Re: Why Case Should not be Dismissed ...) of 01/11/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Re: Why Case Should not be Dismissed ...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department O, Peter A. Hernandez, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference) of 10/13/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • DocketApplication for Issuance of Writ of Execution, Possession or Sale; Filed by JSL Plaza Puente Hills, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • DocketWrit of Execution ((Los Angeles )); Filed by JSL Plaza Puente Hills, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by JSL Plaza Puente Hills, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketJudgment - Unlawful Detainer; Filed by JSL Plaza Puente Hills, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by JSL Plaza Puente Hills, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((Sheng Jian Xu)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((ALL OCCUPANTS)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((Zhi Jian Chen)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by JSL Plaza Puente Hills, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by JSL Plaza Puente Hills, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by JSL Plaza Puente Hills, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JSL PLAZA PUENTE HILLS LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JUNG HAROLD