This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/14/2022 at 00:59:28 (UTC).

JPMORGAN CHASE BANK NA VS WEST H&A LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/10/2018 JPMORGAN CHASE BANK NA filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against WEST H A LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANTHONY MOHR. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9377

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ANTHONY MOHR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JPMORGAN CHASE BANK N.A.

Defendants

SORIA CHRISTIAN ANTHONY

URQUIZU RYAN ALEXANDER

JACKSON MICHAEL C.

DOE 1-50

MARSHALL MICHELLE

WARRANTED EFFECTUATION OF SUBSTITUTE DBA W.E.S.T. INC

WEST H&A LLC DBA WEST HOLDINGS & ACQUISITIONS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorneys

FICKEL ASHLEY R. ESQ.

FICKEL ASHLEY RICHARD ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order -

5/15/2018: Minute Order -

STATEMENT OF DAMAGES (PERSONAL INJURY OR WRONGFUL DEATH)

4/27/2018: STATEMENT OF DAMAGES (PERSONAL INJURY OR WRONGFUL DEATH)

STATEMENT OF DAMAGES (PERSONAL INJURY OR WRONGFUL DEATH)

4/27/2018: STATEMENT OF DAMAGES (PERSONAL INJURY OR WRONGFUL DEATH)

STATEMENT OF DAMAGES (PERSONAL INJURY OR WRONGFUL DEATH)

4/27/2018: STATEMENT OF DAMAGES (PERSONAL INJURY OR WRONGFUL DEATH)

STATEMENT OF DAMAGES (PERSONAL INJURY OR WRONGFUL DEATH)

4/27/2018: STATEMENT OF DAMAGES (PERSONAL INJURY OR WRONGFUL DEATH)

STATEMENT OF DAMAGES (PERSONAL INJURY OR WRONGFUL DEATH)

4/27/2018: STATEMENT OF DAMAGES (PERSONAL INJURY OR WRONGFUL DEATH)

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT -

4/27/2018: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT -

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

5/4/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

5/14/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

6/5/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

Minute Order -

7/12/2018: Minute Order -

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE FAILURE TO FILE REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

7/12/2018: NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE FAILURE TO FILE REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

Minute Order -

9/17/2018: Minute Order -

NOTICE OF RULING

9/18/2018: NOTICE OF RULING

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

11/5/2018: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling re osc for failure to file request for entry of default

11/14/2018: Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling re osc for failure to file request for entry of default

Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Request Ent of Def)

11/14/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Request Ent of Def)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/21/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

34 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/29/2019
  • Docketat 09:15 AM in Department 96, Anthony Mohr, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Failure to File Request Ent of Def) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 96, Anthony Mohr, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Failure to File Request Ent of Def) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Request Ent of Def)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service (Amended); Filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 96, Anthony Mohr, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Failure to File Request Ent of Def) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Request Ent of Def)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 96, Anthony Mohr, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Failure to File Request Ent of Def) - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
63 More Docket Entries
  • 02/27/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • DocketFIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR: 1) CANCELLATION OF WRITTEN INSTRUMENT; ETC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • DocketComplaint ((1st)); Filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR: 1) CANCELLATION OF WRITTEN INSTRUMENT; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

O oo ~ N N

DYKEMA GOSSETT LLP 333 SOUTH GRAND AVENUE SUITE 2100

LOS ANGELES, CA 90071

DYKEMA GOSSETT LLP Sugerlor Cot-n%ganfomga Ashley R. Fickel (SBN 237111) ountv of L.ns Annalag

afickel@dykema.com

Christopher D. Lee (SBN 280738) JAN 10 2018 clee@dykema.com Sherri R. ¢ | 333 South Grand Avenue, Suite 2100 By yeeutive Officor/Clerk Los Angeles, CA 90071 S o Deputy -

Telephone: (213) 457-1800 Facsimile: (213) 457-1850

Attorneys for Plaintiff JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES BC689377

JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A., a National Case No. Association,

Plaintiff, COMPLAINT FOR: VS.

1) CANCELLATION OF WRITTEN

WEST H&A, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability| INSTRUMENT; Company DBA WEST HOLDINGS & . ACQUISITIONS; MICHAEL C. JACKSON, an | 2) DECLARATORY RELIEF individual; RYAN ALEXANDER URQUIZU, REGARDING INTEREST IN REAL an individual; WARRANTED EFFECTUATION PROPERTY OF SUBSTITUTE TRANSFEREE, INC. DBA W.E.S.T., INC., an unknown business entity; 3) NOTARY NEGLIGENCE AND CHRISTIAN ANTHONY SORIA, an individual; LAUREL AVENUE CONDOMINIUMS HOA, 4) FRAUD an unknown association; MICHELLE MARSHALL, an individual; and DOES 1-50, Inclusive,

Defendants.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WEST is a litigant

Latest cases where WEST H&A LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where JPMorgan Chase Bank NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FICKEL ASHLEY R