This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/05/2019 at 09:10:34 (UTC).

JPMORGAN CHASE BANK NA VS WEST H&A LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/18/2017 JPMORGAN CHASE BANK NA filed an Other lawsuit against WEST H A LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are TERRY A. GREEN and TERRY GREEN. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0367

  • Filing Date:

    10/18/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

TERRY A. GREEN

TERRY GREEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

JPMORGAN CHASE BANK NA

Defendants and Respondents

WARRANTED EFFECTURATION OF SUBSTITUTE

INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE

WEST H&A LLC

W.E.S.T. INC

BLAND TAMARA S

PFIZER INC

JACKSON MICHAEL C.

SUMMIT AT PALISADES HIGHLANDS

WEST HOLDINGS & ACQUISITIONS

CITY OF LOS ANGELES

DOES 1 THROUGH 150

YAMADA-TUNG KIMBERLY

SORIA PATRICK

GIFFORD CHRISTIANA

THE BURBANK FIRM LC

BLAND TAMARA S.

BLAND PHILLIP S. M.D.

YAMADA-TUNG KIMBERLY L.

GIFFORD CHRISTINA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

FICKEL ASHLEY R. ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

HART JOSEPH F. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

4/4/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

4/4/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

STATEMENT OF DAMAGES (PERSONAL INJURY OR WRONGFUL DEATH)

4/27/2018: STATEMENT OF DAMAGES (PERSONAL INJURY OR WRONGFUL DEATH)

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

5/10/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

5/10/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

Unknown

5/25/2018: Unknown

Minute Order

6/1/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

6/1/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

8/2/2018: Minute Order

Declaration re: Due Diligence

11/2/2018: Declaration re: Due Diligence

Notice of Ruling

11/14/2018: Notice of Ruling

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

12/20/2017: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

12/20/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

12/20/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

12/20/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

1/4/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

Minute Order

12/6/2017: Minute Order

37 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/18/2019
  • at 08:45 AM in Department 14, Terry Green, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • at 08:45 AM in Department 14, Terry Green, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Default Judgment-Rejected 1/7/19) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Default Judgment)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • Request for Dismissal with prejudice as to the complaint - other: as to Kimberley L. Yamada-Tung, only; Filed by JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) (Statement of Damages); Filed by JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • Proof of Personal Service (Statement of Damages); Filed by JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) (Statement of Damages); Filed by JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
78 More Docket Entries
  • 12/06/2017
  • at 08:45 AM in Department 14; Non-Appearance Case Review - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2017
  • Minute order entered: 2017-12-06 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • STIPULATION RE NONPARTICIPATION AND ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • Stipulation and Order; Filed by JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • COMPLAINT FOR: 1) CANCELLATION OF WRITTEN INSTRUMENT; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where West Holdings and Acquisitions, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where THE BURBANK FIRM L.C. is a litigant

Latest cases where WARRANTED EFFECTUATION OF SUBSTITUTE TRANSFEREE, INC., a Delaware corporation, AKA W.E.S.T. Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where WEST is a litigant