This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/23/2019 at 10:30:39 (UTC).

JPMORGAN BANK, N.A. VS TRAVELERS CASUALTY AND SURETY COMPANY F/K/A THE AETNA CASUALTY AND SURETY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 04/30/2019 JPMORGAN BANK, N A filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against TRAVELERS CASUALTY AND SURETY COMPANY F/K/A THE AETNA CASUALTY AND SURETY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL L. STERN. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5157

  • Filing Date:

    04/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL L. STERN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JPMORGAN BANK N.A.

Defendant

TRAVELERS CASUALTY AND SURETY COMPANY F/K/A THE AETNA CASUALTY AND SURETY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

COHEN ALBERT MARTIN

COHEN ALBERT M.

Defendant Attorney

WAISMAN SONIA SHEBER

 

Court Documents

Complaint

4/30/2019: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/30/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/30/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/2/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

5/2/2019: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Proof of Personal Service

6/14/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

6/3/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Certificate of Mailing for

7/26/2019: Certificate of Mailing for

Minute Order

7/26/2019: Minute Order

Notice of Settlement

7/26/2019: Notice of Settlement

Answer

7/18/2019: Answer

Case Management Statement

7/16/2019: Case Management Statement

Stipulation - No Order

8/19/2019: Stipulation - No Order

Request for Dismissal

8/19/2019: Request for Dismissal

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/19/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by JPMORGAN BANK, N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • DocketStipulation - No Order (of Dismissal with Prejudice); Filed by JPMORGAN BANK, N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • Docketat 1:18 PM in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 07/26/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by JPMORGAN BANK, N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • DocketAnswer (to Complaint); Filed by TRAVELERS CASUALTY AND SURETY COMPANY F/K/A THE AETNA CASUALTY AND SURETY COMPANY (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by JPMORGAN BANK, N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by JPMORGAN BANK, N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by JPMORGAN BANK, N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by JPMORGAN BANK, N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by JPMORGAN BANK, N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JPMORGAN BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION is a litigant

Latest cases where TRAVELERS CASUALTY & SURETY COMPANY OF AMERICA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WAISMAN SONIA SHEBER