This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/04/2021 at 19:30:13 (UTC).

JOYCE NESBITT VS SPEECH AND LANGUAGE PATHOLOGY ASSOCIATES, INC.

Case Summary

On 12/30/2020 JOYCE NESBITT filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against SPEECH AND LANGUAGE PATHOLOGY ASSOCIATES, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TERESA A. BEAUDET. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9813

  • Filing Date:

    12/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

TERESA A. BEAUDET

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NESBITT JOYCE

Defendant

SPEECH AND LANGUAGE PATHOLOGY ASSOCIATES INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

YOON LINETTE

Other Attorneys

STERLING SARAH KRISTINA

 

Court Documents

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO STAY ALL PROCEEDINGS PENDING MEDIATION AND TO ALLOW DEFENDANTS PARTICIPATION IN LIMITED DISCOVERY

8/23/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO STAY ALL PROCEEDINGS PENDING MEDIATION AND TO ALLOW DEFENDANTS PARTICIPATION IN LIMITED DISCOVERY

Order - ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO STAY ALL PROCEEDINGS PENDING MEDIATION AND TO ALLOW DEFENDANTS PARTICIPATION IN LIMITED DISCOVERY

8/23/2021: Order - ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO STAY ALL PROCEEDINGS PENDING MEDIATION AND TO ALLOW DEFENDANTS PARTICIPATION IN LIMITED DISCOVERY

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/4/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/4/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

2/2/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION TO STAY ALL PROCEEDINGS PENDING MEDIATION AND TO ALLOW DEFENDANTS PARTICIPATION IN THE INFORMAL EXCHANGE OF INFORMATION PRIOR TO HEARIN

3/8/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION TO STAY ALL PROCEEDINGS PENDING MEDIATION AND TO ALLOW DEFENDANTS PARTICIPATION IN THE INFORMAL EXCHANGE OF INFORMATION PRIOR TO HEARIN

Answer

4/7/2021: Answer

Case Management Statement

4/16/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

4/20/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Order

5/3/2021: Case Management Order

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

5/3/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/30/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/30/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

12/30/2020: Complaint

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/20/2022
  • Hearing07/20/2022 at 09:30 AM in Department 50 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • Hearing07/08/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 50 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • Hearing07/01/2022 at 4:00 PM in Department 50 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • Hearing03/22/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 50 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order (to Stay All Proceedings Pending Mediation And to Allow Defendants Participation in Limited Discovery); Filed by Speech and Language Pathology Associates, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketOrder (Granting Stipulation to Stay All Proceedings Pending Mediation and to Allow Defendants Participation in Limited Discovery); Filed by Speech and Language Pathology Associates, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 50, Teresa A. Beaudet, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketCase Management Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Speech and Language Pathology Associates, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Joyce Nesbitt (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Speech and Language Pathology Associates, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order (Joint Stipulation to Stay All Proceedings Pending Mediation and to Allow Defendant?s Participation in the Informal Exchange of Information Prior to Hearing on Defendant?s Motion to Compel); Filed by Speech and Language Pathology Associates, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Joyce Nesbitt (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Joyce Nesbitt (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Joyce Nesbitt (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Joyce Nesbitt (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer STERLING SARAH K.