This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/05/2020 at 09:29:49 (UTC).

JOYCE CARRELL ET AL VS JARED ROSS GILLISPIE ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/28/2017 JOYCE CARRELL filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JARED ROSS GILLISPIE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are PATRICIA D. NIETO, YOLANDA OROZCO, LAURA A. SEIGLE and EDWARD B. MORETON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5538

  • Filing Date:

    03/28/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

PATRICIA D. NIETO

YOLANDA OROZCO

LAURA A. SEIGLE

EDWARD B. MORETON

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Petitioners, Guardian Ad Litems, Cross Defendants and Not Classified By Court

CARRELL JOYCE

ROES 1 - 10 INCLUSIVE

Defendants, Respondents and Not Classified By Court

GILLESPIE JARED ROSS

GILLISPIE JARED ROSS

ORANGE COURIER INC.

ONESOURCE DISTRIBUTERS

EAN HOLDINGS LLC

ONESOURCE DISTRIBUTERS HOLDINGS LLC

EVELL

DOES 1-50 INCLUSIVE

GILLISPIE JARED ROSS AKA JARED ROSS GILLESPIE

Defendant, Respondent and Cross Plaintiff

ORANGE COURIER INC.

Minors and Not Classified By Court

BELL VISION

ELLIS DEACE

BUSH DUERRE

FRANCIS DILEGENG

Minors, Not Classified By Court, Guardian Ad Litems and Cross Defendants

BELL VISION

ELLIS DEACE

GILLESPIE JARED ROSS

CARRELL JOYCE

BUSH DUERRE

FRANCIS DILEGENG

CROSS-DEFENDANT JOYCE CARRELL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Minor, Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

LIBERATORE ANTHONY A. ESQ.

BECK DWAYNE S. ESQ.

LIBERATORE ANTHONY ALBERT ESQ.

BECK DWAYNE STEVEN ESQ.

LIBERATORE ANTHONY ALBERT

BECK DWAYNE STEVEN

Defendant, Respondent and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

LENHARDT DAVID P. ESQ.

LENHARDT DAVID PAUL

LENHARDT DAVID PAUL ESQ.

LEVERONE JACKSON THOMAS

LEVERONE JACKSON

LENHARDT DAVID P.

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

BECK DWAYNE STEVEN

 

Court Documents

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF ANTHONY A. LIBERATORE RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PROOF OF DEPOSIT IN BLOCKED ACCOUNT FOR DUERRE BUSH, DEACE ELLIS AND DILEGEND FRANCIS

3/6/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF ANTHONY A. LIBERATORE RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PROOF OF DEPOSIT IN BLOCKED ACCOUNT FOR DUERRE BUSH, DEACE ELLIS AND DILEGEND FRANCIS

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PROOF OF DEPOSIT IN BLOCKED ACCOUNT (...)

3/11/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PROOF OF DEPOSIT IN BLOCKED ACCOUNT (...)

Order to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account

12/17/2019: Order to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account

Order to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account

12/12/2019: Order to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account

Petition - PETITION AMENDED PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF PENDING ACTION FOR MINOR (DUERRE BUSH)

11/22/2019: Petition - PETITION AMENDED PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF PENDING ACTION FOR MINOR (DUERRE BUSH)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

9/27/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER RE. HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY ...)

8/29/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER RE. HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY ...)

Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

6/24/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

Stipulation - No Order - Stipulation - No Order to Continue Trial and all Related Discovery and Pre-Trial Cut-Off Dates

3/4/2019: Stipulation - No Order - Stipulation - No Order to Continue Trial and all Related Discovery and Pre-Trial Cut-Off Dates

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Quash DEPOSITION SUBPOENA FOR ORAL EXAMI...)

3/5/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Quash DEPOSITION SUBPOENA FOR ORAL EXAMI...)

Proof of Service by Mail - Amended Proof of Service by Mail

12/27/2018: Proof of Service by Mail - Amended Proof of Service by Mail

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

3/14/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM-CIVIL

1/24/2018: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM-CIVIL

SUMMONS

2/21/2018: SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

3/29/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

Other - - Demand for Jury Trial

3/29/2018: Other - - Demand for Jury Trial

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

3/28/2017: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM - CIVIL

6/16/2017: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM - CIVIL

120 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/04/2020
  • Hearing12/04/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Proof of Deposit in Blocked Account (Deace Ellis)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • Hearing12/04/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • Hearing12/04/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Proof of Deposit in Blocked Account (Dilegend Francis)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • Hearing12/04/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Proof of Deposit in Blocked Account (Duerre Bush)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • Hearing11/05/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Ex Parte Application TO PRESENT AMENDED ORDERS RE: MINOR?S COMPROMISES OF DILEGEND FRANCIS, DEACE ELLIS AND DUERRE BUSH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketEx Parte Application (TO PRESENT AMENDED ORDERS RE: MINOR?S COMPROMISES OF DILEGEND FRANCIS, DEACE ELLIS AND DUERRE BUSH); Filed by Joyce Carrell (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketNotice of Lodging ([PROPOSED] AMENDED ORDERS TO DEPOSIT MONEY INTO BLOCKED ACCOUNT FOR THE MINORS, DILEGEND FRANCIS, DEACE ELLIS AND DUERRE BUSH); Filed by Joyce Carrell (Plaintiff); Dilegend Francis (Plaintiff); Deace Ellis (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 27, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 27, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Proof of Deposit in Blocked Account (Deace Ellis)) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 27, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Proof of Deposit in Blocked Account (Dilegend Francis)) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
188 More Docket Entries
  • 03/28/2017
  • DocketAPPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2017
  • DocketAPPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2017
  • DocketAPPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2017
  • DocketAPPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: (1) NEGLIGENCE; AND (2) NEGLIGENT ENTRUSTMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2017
  • DocketApplication ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2017
  • DocketApplication ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2017
  • DocketApplication ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Joyce Carrell (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2017
  • DocketApplication ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC655538    Hearing Date: December 11, 2019    Dept: 4B

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE: PETITIONS TO APPROVE MINOR’S COMPROMISE

Duerre Bush

Claimant Duerre Bush (“Claimant”), a minor, by and through his Guardian Ad Litem, Joyce Carrell (“Petitioner”), has agreed to settle his claims against Defendants Orange Courier, Inc. and Jared Ross Gillispie in exchange for $55,000.00. If approved, $3,840.75 will be used for medical expenses, $18,333.00 will be used for attorney’s fees, and $13,239.60 will be used for non-medical expenses, leaving a balance of $19,586.65 for Claimant, to be deposited into a blocked account, subject to withdrawal only upon authorization of the court.

Court approval is required for all settlements of a minor’s claim. (Probate Code §§ 3500, 3600, et seq.; Code Civ. Proc. § 372.) The Court has reviewed the proposed settlement and finds that it is fair and reasonable. Further, the requested attorney’s fees, which amounts to approximately 33% of the total settlement, is fair and reasonable.

The unopposed Petition to approve minor’s compromise is GRANTED. However, counsel is to file before the hearing a copy of the Order to Deposit Money into Blocked Account showing $19,586.65 to be deposited.

The Court sets an OSC for March 11, 2020 at 8:30 a.m. in Department 4B for proof of deposit in the blocked account. (Cal. Rules of Court, Rule 7.953(a).) If an acknowledgement of receipt by the financial institution is filed before that date, no appearance will be required.

Per California Rules of Court, Rule 7.952, Petitioner and Claimant must appear at the December 11, 2019 hearing, unless the Court finds good cause to excuse their appearance. The Court finds that Claimant’s appearance is not necessary, but will require Petitioner to appear.

Deace Ellis

Claimant Deace Ellis (“Claimant”), a minor, by and through his Guardian Ad Litem, Joyce Carrell (“Petitioner”), has agreed to settle his claims against Defendants Orange Courier, Inc. and Jared Ross Gillispie in exchange for $55,000.00. If approved, $5,121 will be used for medical expenses, $18,333.00 will be used for attorney’s fees, and $13,239.60 will be used for non-medical expenses, leaving a balance of $18,306.40 for Claimant, to be deposited into a blocked account, subject to withdrawal only upon authorization of the court.

Court approval is required for all settlements of a minor’s claim. (Probate Code §§ 3500, 3600, et seq.; Code Civ. Proc. § 372.) The Court has reviewed the proposed settlement and finds that it is fair and reasonable. Further, the requested attorney’s fees, which amounts to approximately 33% of the total settlement, is fair and reasonable.

The unopposed Petition to approve minor’s compromise is GRANTED.

The Court sets an OSC for March 11, 2020 at 8:30 a.m. in Department 4B for proof of deposit in the blocked account. (Cal. Rules of Court, Rule 7.953(a).) If an acknowledgement of receipt by the financial institution is filed before that date, no appearance will be required.

Per California Rules of Court, Rule 7.952, Petitioner and Claimant must appear at the December 11, 2019 hearing, unless the Court finds good cause to excuse their appearance. The Court finds that Claimant’s appearance is not necessary, but will require Petitioner to appear.

Dilegend Francis

Claimant Dilegend Francis (“Claimant”), a minor, by and through his Guardian Ad Litem, Joyce Carrell (“Petitioner”), has agreed to settle his claims against Defendants Orange Courier, Inc. and Jared Ross Gillispie in exchange for $55,000.00. If approved, $2,323.60 will be used for medical expenses, $18,333.00 will be used for attorney’s fees, and $13,239.60 will be used for non-medical expenses, leaving a balance of $21,100.80 for Claimant, to be deposited into a blocked account, subject to withdrawal only upon authorization of the court.

Court approval is required for all settlements of a minor’s claim. (Probate Code §§ 3500, 3600, et seq.; Code Civ. Proc. § 372.) The Court has reviewed the proposed settlement and finds that it is fair and reasonable. Further, the requested attorney’s fees, which amounts to approximately 33% of the total settlement, is fair and reasonable.

The unopposed Petition to approve minor’s compromise is GRANTED.

The Court sets an OSC for March 11, 2020 at 8:30 a.m. in Department 4B for proof of deposit in the blocked account. (Cal. Rules of Court, Rule 7.953(a).) If an acknowledgement of receipt by the financial institution is filed before that date, no appearance will be required.

Per California Rules of Court, Rule 7.952, Petitioner and Claimant must appear at the December 11, 2019 hearing, unless the Court finds good cause to excuse their appearance. The Court finds that Claimant’s appearance is not necessary, but will require Petitioner to appear.

Moving parties to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the Court at SSCDEPT4B@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative.