This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/21/2023 at 15:25:45 (UTC).

JOY NWAKAEGO LEKIC VS DAVID VARELIA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/30/2022 JOY NWAKAEGO LEKIC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against DAVID VARELIA,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8244

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LEKIC JOY NWAKAEGO

Defendants

CITY OF TORRANCE

VARELIA DAVID

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PRICE MATTHEW RYAN

Defendant Attorney

BEAN GALEN WARREN

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

8/30/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

8/30/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

8/30/2022: Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

8/30/2022: Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/30/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/30/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

8/30/2022: Complaint

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

9/27/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Proof of Personal Service

9/22/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

9/22/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

10/3/2022: Answer

Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSES DEFENDANT CITY OF TORRANCE'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES; DEMAND FOR PROD

12/27/2022: Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSES DEFENDANT CITY OF TORRANCE'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES; DEMAND FOR PROD

Declaration - DECLARATION OF GALEN W. BEAN IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES AND REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET ONE

12/27/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF GALEN W. BEAN IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES AND REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET ONE

Separate Statement

12/27/2022: Separate Statement

Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts

12/27/2022: Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2024
  • Hearing08/27/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2024
  • Hearing02/27/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2024
  • Hearing02/13/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2023
  • Hearing05/10/2023 at 1:30 PM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2023
  • Hearing04/20/2023 at 11:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses DEFENDANT CITY OF TORRANCE'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES; DEMAND FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET ONE; REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS: Name Extension: DEFENDANT CITY OF TORRANCE'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES; DEMAND FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET ONE; REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS ; As To Parties changed from Joy Nwakaego Lekic (Plaintiff) to Joy Nwakaego Lekic (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses scheduled for 05/10/2023 at 01:30 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketInformal Discovery Conference (IDC) scheduled for 04/20/2023 at 11:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketMotion to Compel Further Discovery Responses; Filed by: City of Torrance (Defendant); As to: Joy Nwakaego Lekic (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketSeparate Statement; Filed by: City of Torrance (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 08/31/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 29 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 02/13/2024 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/27/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Joy Nwakaego Lekic (Plaintiff); As to: David Varelia (Defendant); City of Torrance (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Joy Nwakaego Lekic (Plaintiff); As to: David Varelia (Defendant); City of Torrance (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Joy Nwakaego Lekic (Plaintiff); As to: David Varelia (Defendant); City of Torrance (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketSeventh Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CITY OF TORRANCE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Price, Matthew R