This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/12/2021 at 13:12:49 (UTC).

JOY DONAHUE VS JUDITH ROBIN VICTOR

Case Summary

On 11/10/2020 JOY DONAHUE filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JUDITH ROBIN VICTOR. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3245

  • Filing Date:

    11/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DONAHUE JOY

Defendant

VICTOR JUDITH ROBIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

KARPEL DONALD E.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/07/2023
  • Hearing11/07/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • Hearing05/10/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • Hearing04/26/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedure and Hearing Dates {\par} {\par} {\par}); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Joy Donahue (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Joy Donahue (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Joy Donahue (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KARPEL DONALD E. ESQ.