This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/26/2022 at 12:44:55 (UTC).

JOY ANDERSON, ET AL. VS COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/22/2022 JOY ANDERSON, filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6953

  • Filing Date:

    11/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ANDERSON JOY

BOCATIJA MICHAEL

DUNN CHANIYA

ELMALIK RASHID

FORD DAMONTE

FORD DONTA

GALLOWAY VELMA

GOODO PRINCE

HAYWOOD VALERIE

HOLDEN ANTHONY

IUTA POOKELAALAKAI

IUTA TANYA

JOHNSON BRANDI

JOYNER TANYE

LANDEROS JESSICA

LAWRENCE AREIONN

LAWRENCE JR. JAMES

Defendants

CITY OF CARSON

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

DAY TO DAY IMPORTS INC.

27 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WRIGHT DAVID

 

Court Documents

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

11/22/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

11/22/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/22/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

11/22/2022: Complaint

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

11/22/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Notice of Related Case

11/23/2022: Notice of Related Case

Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

12/2/2022: Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE)

12/2/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE)

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM (ERIC ROUSSEAU II)

12/7/2022: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM (ERIC ROUSSEAU II)

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM (BRIANNA PARHAM)

12/7/2022: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM (BRIANNA PARHAM)

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM (KASHTON TAYLOR)

12/7/2022: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM (KASHTON TAYLOR)

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM (MILAH BOCATIJA)

12/7/2022: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM (MILAH BOCATIJA)

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM (AMYIAH TAYLOR)

12/7/2022: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM (AMYIAH TAYLOR)

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM (MALIAH BOCATIJA)

12/7/2022: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM (MALIAH BOCATIJA)

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM (ZOEY MAYFIELD)

12/7/2022: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM (ZOEY MAYFIELD)

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM (JAMES LAWRENCE III)

12/7/2022: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM (JAMES LAWRENCE III)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

12/19/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Further Status Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketFurther Status Conference scheduled for 12/19/2022 at 02:00 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 11 updated: Result Date to 12/19/2022; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketThe case is removed from the special status of: Provisionally Complex Case Type

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (Zoey Mayfield); Signed and Filed by: Tanye Joyner (Plaintiff); As to: Zoey Mayfield (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (Zoey Mayfield): Filed By: Tanye Joyner (Plaintiff); Result: Granted ; Result Date: 12/07/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (Milah Bocatija); Signed and Filed by: Michael Bocatija (Plaintiff); As to: Milah Bocatija (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (Milah Bocatija): Filed By: Michael Bocatija (Plaintiff); Result: Granted ; Result Date: 12/07/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (Maliah Bocatija); Signed and Filed by: Michael Bocatija (Plaintiff); As to: Maliah Bocatija (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (Maliah Bocatija): Filed By: Michael Bocatija (Plaintiff); Result: Granted ; Result Date: 12/07/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (Kashton Taylor); Signed and Filed by: Ursula Medina (Plaintiff); As to: Kashton Taylor (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketCase numbers 22STCV36953, 21STCV38929 are related; case number 21STCV38929 is the lead case.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketClerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by: Joy Anderson (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketCase assigned in Department 11 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Joy Anderson (Plaintiff); Maliah Bocatija (Plaintiff); Michael Bocatija (Plaintiff); Milah Bocatija (Plaintiff); Chaniya Dunn (Plaintiff); Rashid Elmalik (Plaintiff); Damonte Ford (Plaintiff); Donta Ford (Plaintiff); Velma Galloway (Plaintiff); Prince Goodo (Plaintiff); Muhnee Guidry (Plaintiff); Valerie Haywood (Plaintiff); Anthony Holden (Plaintiff); Pookelaalakai Iuta (Plaintiff); Tanya Iuta (Plaintiff); Brandi Johnson (Plaintiff); Tanye Joyner (Plaintiff); Jessica Landeros (Plaintiff); Areionn Lawrence (Plaintiff); James Lawrence Jr. (Plaintiff); James Lawrence, III (Plaintiff); Nicole Lawrence (Plaintiff); Angela Lee (Plaintiff); Jasmine Matthews (Plaintiff); Christopher Mayfield (Plaintiff); Morgan Mayfield (Plaintiff); Zoey Mayfield (Plaintiff); Ursula Medina (Plaintiff); Briana Morris (Plaintiff); Nancy Ocadiz (Plaintiff); Sonny Ocadiz (Plaintiff); Brianna Parham (Plaintiff); Magnolia Perry (Plaintiff); Tori Perry (Plaintiff); Lloyd Pickett (Plaintiff); Kat

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Joy Anderson (Plaintiff); Maliah Bocatija (Plaintiff); Michael Bocatija (Plaintiff); Milah Bocatija (Plaintiff); Chaniya Dunn (Plaintiff); Rashid Elmalik (Plaintiff); Damonte Ford (Plaintiff); Donta Ford (Plaintiff); Velma Galloway (Plaintiff); Prince Goodo (Plaintiff); Muhnee Guidry (Plaintiff); Valerie Haywood (Plaintiff); Anthony Holden (Plaintiff); Pookelaalakai Iuta (Plaintiff); Tanya Iuta (Plaintiff); Brandi Johnson (Plaintiff); Tanye Joyner (Plaintiff); Jessica Landeros (Plaintiff); Areionn Lawrence (Plaintiff); James Lawrence Jr. (Plaintiff); James Lawrence, III (Plaintiff); Nicole Lawrence (Plaintiff); Angela Lee (Plaintiff); Jasmine Matthews (Plaintiff); Christopher Mayfield (Plaintiff); Morgan Mayfield (Plaintiff); Zoey Mayfield (Plaintiff); Ursula Medina (Plaintiff); Briana Morris (Plaintiff); Nancy Ocadiz (Plaintiff); Sonny Ocadiz (Plaintiff); Brianna Parham (Plaintiff); Magnolia Perry (Plaintiff); Tori Perry (Plaintiff); Lloyd Pickett (Pl

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Provisionally Complex Case Type

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less