This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/27/2019 at 06:04:44 (UTC).

JOVENITA-LAUREL CANYON INVESTORS LLC VS NATHANIEL HUNT ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/11/2018 JOVENITA-LAUREL CANYON INVESTORS LLC filed an Other lawsuit against NATHANIEL HUNT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MAUREEN DUFFY-LEWIS. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0133

  • Filing Date:

    05/11/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MAUREEN DUFFY-LEWIS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JOVENITA-LAUREL CANYON INVESTORS LLC

Defendants

FRANK ADAM MICHAEL

HUNT NATHANIEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

MENKE LAW FIRM APC

Respondent and Defendant Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF ANTHONY N. RANIERI

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

9/4/2018: Request for Dismissal

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

9/5/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

Minute Order

7/18/2018: Minute Order

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER

7/23/2018: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

7/11/2018: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

6/13/2018: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

COMPLAINT-CONTRACT

5/11/2018: COMPLAINT-CONTRACT

Summons on Cross Complaint

5/11/2018: Summons on Cross Complaint

COMPLAINT-CONTRACT

5/11/2018: COMPLAINT-CONTRACT

ANSWER-UNLAWFUL DETAINER

5/11/2018: ANSWER-UNLAWFUL DETAINER

COMPLAINT-UNLAWFUL DETAINER

5/11/2018: COMPLAINT-UNLAWFUL DETAINER

SUMMONS (UNLAWFUL DETAINER

5/11/2018: SUMMONS (UNLAWFUL DETAINER

Proof of Service by 1st Class Mail

5/11/2018: Proof of Service by 1st Class Mail

ANSWER TO UNVERIFIED AMENDED COMPLAINT

5/11/2018: ANSWER TO UNVERIFIED AMENDED COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF REJECTION

5/11/2018: NOTICE OF REJECTION

ORDER

5/11/2018: ORDER

STIPULATION AGREEING TO THE FILING OF A FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

5/11/2018: STIPULATION AGREEING TO THE FILING OF A FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

EX PARTE APPLICATION

5/11/2018: EX PARTE APPLICATION

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 38; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Case Deemed Settled) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 38; (OSC RE Dismissal; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • Docketat 08:00 AM in Department 38; Court Order (Court Order; Case Deemed Settled) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by JOVENITA-LAUREL CANYON INVESTORS, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
60 More Docket Entries
  • 05/11/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-CONTRACT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • DocketANSWER TO UNVERIFIED AMENDED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF REJECTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE OF RECLASSIFICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • DocketEX PARTE APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; ETC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • DocketVERIFIED CROSS-COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-UNLAWFUL DETAINER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • DocketORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION)

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

BLOZ/ES/E0 FILED

7 ‘ Superior Court of Californi MENKE LAW FIRM, APC ounty of Los Angeles g, perior Colu-rtEofDCalifornia Bruce R. Menke, SBN: 116014 ounty of Los Angeles

Dana J. Seyler, SBN: 165062 MAY 11 2018

5000 E. Spring Street, Suite 405 MAR 2 2 2018

Long Beach, CA 90815 Sherri B, Carter, Executive Officer/Clerk

Telephone: (562) 496-4300 By : oefihfi"i R. Cafier, Executive Officer/Clerk

Facsimile: (562) 496-4500 . Paut R. Cruz By Deputy . . - Isabel Jaime

Attorneys for Plaintiff, . JOVENITA-LAUREL CANYON INVESTORS, LLC

CENTRAL DISTRICT

JOVENITA-LAUREL CANYON Case No17sTUD0ssg7 BC700133 INVESTORS, LLC

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR LEAVE

Plaintiff(s), TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF vs. POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF DANA J. SEYLER

NATHANIEL HUNT, et ai | AND RE EX PARTE NOTICE; SIGNED . . STIPULATION OF THE PARTIES; Defendant(s). [proposed] FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; [peepesed] ORDER

[CCP § 464 et. seq.] Hearing: March 22, 2018

Dept. No.: 94 - Action Filed: December 15, 2017

Time ' l‘v%O‘OM

TO EACH PARTY AND TO COUNSEL OF RECORD FOR EACH PARTY: YOU

ARE HEREBY NOTIFIED THAT on March 22, 2018 at 1.30pm in Department 94 of the above-entitled Court, located ét 111 N. Hill Street, Los Angeles CA 90012, Plaintiff Jovenita-

Laurel Canyon Investors, LLC will apply to the Court ex parte for an order permitting the filing

of a First Amended Complaint. A copy of the proposed First Amended Complaint, and a