Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/06/2021 at 03:11:46 (UTC).

JOVAN SOTELO VS FCA US LLC

Case Summary

On 02/18/2021 JOVAN SOTELO filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against FCA US LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Glendale Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0226

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Glendale Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SOTELO JOVAN

Defendant

FCA US LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BASOLA JENNIFER

Defendant Attorney

HANSON ERIN

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

5/4/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

Notice of Ruling

5/5/2021: Notice of Ruling

Notice of Settlement

4/26/2021: Notice of Settlement

Answer

4/12/2021: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

3/19/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/18/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

2/18/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/18/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/18/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/18/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

2/18/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/26/2021
  • Hearing07/26/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department D at 600 East Broadway, Glendale, CA 91206; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal After Settlement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by FCA US LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department D; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Jovan Sotelo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by FCA US LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Jovan Sotelo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jovan Sotelo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Jovan Sotelo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jovan Sotelo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FCA US LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BASOLA JENNIFER