This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/01/2023 at 13:41:16 (UTC).

JOURDAN WHITEHEAD VS GOOD AMERICAN. LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/15/2023 JOURDAN WHITEHEAD filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against GOOD AMERICAN LLC,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TERESA A. BEAUDET. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3341

  • Filing Date:

    02/15/2023

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

TERESA A. BEAUDET

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WHITEHEAD JOURDAN

Defendants

BFT ENTERTAINMENT LLC

GOOD AMERICAN. LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HALL TIMOTHY A.

Defendant Attorneys

STERMAN KARINA BESS

LEGITTINO TRICIA L

 

Court Documents

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

8/31/2023: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Request for Dismissal

8/28/2023: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Settlement

8/24/2023: Notice of Settlement

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 08/24/2023

8/24/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 08/24/2023

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

8/24/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

7/31/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

7/14/2023: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

7/7/2023: Case Management Statement

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF SERVICE (NOT SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT) OF NOTICE RE CONTINUANCE OF HEARING AND ORDER

6/6/2023: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF SERVICE (NOT SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT) OF NOTICE RE CONTINUANCE OF HEARING AND ORDER

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

6/1/2023: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Case Management Statement

5/25/2023: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

5/24/2023: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

5/23/2023: Case Management Statement

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

4/25/2023: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Answer

4/10/2023: Answer

Answer

4/7/2023: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

3/27/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

3/17/2023: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2023
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Filed by: Jourdan Whitehead (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Request for Dismissal: Filed By: Jourdan Whitehead (Plaintiff); Result: Entered ; Result Date: 08/29/2023 ; As To Parties changed from Good American. LLC (Defendant) to Good American. LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 10/12/2023 at 10:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 50 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 08/29/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 10/30/2023 at 10:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 50 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 08/29/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2023
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Jourdan Whitehead on 02/15/2023, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Jourdan Whitehead as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2023
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Jourdan Whitehead (Plaintiff); As to: Good American. LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 10/12/2023 at 10:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2023
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by: Jourdan Whitehead (Plaintiff); Vacate Future Dates: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 08/24/2023; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
40 More Docket Entries
  • 02/17/2023
  • DocketAddress for Timothy A. Hall (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Jourdan Whitehead (Plaintiff); As to: Good American. LLC (Defendant); BFT Entertainment LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Teresa A. Beaudet in Department 50 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • DocketAddress for Timothy A. Hall (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Jourdan Whitehead (Plaintiff); As to: Good American. LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Jourdan Whitehead (Plaintiff); As to: Good American. LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less