This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/02/2020 at 15:29:40 (UTC).

JOST, DAVID VS MAGNAYE, MARICEL

Case Summary

On 02/07/2020 JOST, DAVID filed a Family - Harassment lawsuit against MAGNAYE, MARICEL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DORDI, FIRDAUS F. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0210

  • Filing Date:

    02/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DORDI, FIRDAUS F

 

Party Details

Petitioner

JOST DAVID

Respondent

MAGNAYE MARICEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

BOWMAN STANLEY DREW

 

Court Documents

Substitution of Attorney - SUB IN

2/28/2020: Substitution of Attorney - SUB IN

Minute Order

2/28/2020: Minute Order

Proof of Service - Mail - MAILED 2-13-2020: CH-250

2/18/2020: Proof of Service - Mail - MAILED 2-13-2020: CH-250

Response - Civil Harassment

2/18/2020: Response - Civil Harassment

Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003

2/14/2020: Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003

Proof of Service - notice of hearing and tro

2/11/2020: Proof of Service - notice of hearing and tro

Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

2/7/2020: Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

Petition - Civil Harassment

2/7/2020: Petition - Civil Harassment

Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

2/7/2020: Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

2/7/2020: Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

Miscellaneous - Civil Case Cover Sheet Addendum

2/7/2020: Miscellaneous - Civil Case Cover Sheet Addendum

Response - Civil Harassment

2/4/2020: Response - Civil Harassment

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2020
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department J, Dordi, Firdaus F, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Denied - With Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney (SUB IN ); Filed by Attorney for Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Mail (MAILED 2-13-2020: CH-250 ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketResponse - Civil Harassment; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketFee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketFee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketProof of Service (notice of hearing and tro ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketPetition - Civil Harassment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketMiscellaneous (Civil Case Cover Sheet Addendum ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketResponse - Civil Harassment; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BOWMAN STANLEY D.