This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/28/2021 at 14:49:57 (UTC).

JOSIE GARCIA, ET AL. VS CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS AND REHABILITATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/21/2021 JOSIE GARCIA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS AND REHABILITATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8917

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GARCIA ASHLEY ELOISA

GARCIA JOSIE

GARCIA RAYMOND

MONGE ANDREW

Defendants

CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS AND REHABILITATION

CALIFORNIA HIGHWAY PATROL

REFUGIO JIMMY CISNEROS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HOSHARIAN PETER ASHOT

 

Court Documents

Complaint

10/21/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/21/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/21/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

11/4/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

11/4/2021: PI General Order

Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

11/23/2021: Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR DEAGON

11/23/2021: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR DEAGON

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR CARTER

11/23/2021: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR CARTER

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/17/2024
  • Hearing10/17/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2023
  • Hearing04/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • Hearing04/06/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for Carter); Filed by CARTER BENTLEY DICKEY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for Deagon); Filed by DEAGON CARSON DICKEY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection of Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by JOSIE GARCIA (Plaintiff); RAYMOND GARCIA (Plaintiff); DEAGON CARSON DICKEY (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by JOSIE GARCIA (Plaintiff); RAYMOND GARCIA (Plaintiff); DEAGON CARSON DICKEY (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CALIFORNIA HIGHWAY PATROL is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HOSHARIAN PETER A. ESQ.