This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/04/2019 at 00:27:08 (UTC).

JOSHUA WOLFSON VS BENJAMIN SILVESTRE-PACHECO ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/20/2017 JOSHUA WOLFSON filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against BENJAMIN SILVESTRE-PACHECO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5089

  • Filing Date:

    06/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

WOLFSON JOSHUA

Defendants and Respondents

SILVESTRE-PACHECO BENJAMIN

DOES 1 TO 20 INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorneys

BASSELL TORSTEN M. ESQ.

JACOBS STANLEY K. ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

DUNKIN CRAIG L. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

ANSWER OF DEFENDANT BENJAMIN SILVESTRE-PACHECO TO PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT

8/21/2017: ANSWER OF DEFENDANT BENJAMIN SILVESTRE-PACHECO TO PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT

Proof of Personal Service

8/1/2017: Proof of Personal Service

Complaint

6/20/2017: Complaint

CoverSheet

6/20/2017: CoverSheet

Notice of Ruling

5/17/2019: Notice of Ruling

Ex Parte Application

5/15/2019: Ex Parte Application

Minute Order

5/15/2019: Minute Order

Stipulation to Continue Trial/FSC [and Related Motion/Discovery Dates] Personal Injury Courts Only (Department 91, 92, 93, 97)

12/13/2018: Stipulation to Continue Trial/FSC [and Related Motion/Discovery Dates] Personal Injury Courts Only (Department 91, 92, 93, 97)

Minute Order

12/4/2018: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2019
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Benjamin Silvestre-Pacheco (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (to continue trial and all expert discovery and pre-trial motion deadlines) - Held - Motion Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • DocketEx Parte Application (Joint Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial); Filed by Benjamin Silvestre-Pacheco (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to continue trial and all exp...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; (OSC RE Dismissal) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • Docket[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by Benjamin Silvestre-Pacheco (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • DocketMinute Order ((Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Benjamin Silvestre-Pacheco (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • DocketANSWER OF DEFENDANT BENJAMIN SILVESTRE-PACHECO TO PLAINTIFF S COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • DocketProof of Personal Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Joshua Wolfson (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Joshua Wolfson (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • DocketSummons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Joshua Wolfson (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****5089    Hearing Date: January 08, 2021    Dept: 32

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 32

joshua wolfson,

Plaintiff,

v.

BENJAMIN SILVESTRE-PACHECO,

Defendant.

Case No.: ****5089

Hearing Date: January 8, 2021

[TENTATIVE] order RE:

motion for leave to intervene by AMERICAN ZURICH INSURANCE COMPANY

Proposed American Zurich Insurance Company (“Intervenor”) seeks leave to intervene in this action. Intervenor represents that it paid workers’ compensation benefits to Plaintiff as a result of the collision at issue in this case. Intervenor seeks leave to intervene per Labor Code section 3852. Per Labor Code sections 3852 and 3853, Intervenor may join this action. While Plaintiff and Defendant oppose intervention, Intervenor has the “unconditional right to intervene in the action at any time before trial on the facts.” (Mar v. Sakti Internat. Corp. (1992) 9 Cal.App.4th 1780, 1782, internal quotation omitted.) Accordingly, the Court grants the motion.

CONCLUSION AND ORDER

Intervenor’s motion for leave to intervene is granted. Intervenor’s proposed complaint in intervention shall be filed within ten days. Intervenor is to give notice of this order, and file proof of service of such.

DATED: January 8, 2021 ___________________________

Stephen I. Goorvitch

Judge of the Superior Court



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DUNKIN CRAIG L.