Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/12/2021 at 14:47:47 (UTC).

JOSHUA SHARFI VS SARAH NETTO

Case Summary

On 03/16/2021 JOSHUA SHARFI filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SARAH NETTO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0307

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SHARFI JOSHUA

Defendant

NETTO SARAH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCHWIMER MICHAEL EVAN

 

Court Documents

PI General Order

4/6/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

4/6/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/16/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/16/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/16/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/16/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

3/16/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/12/2024
  • Hearing03/12/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • Hearing09/13/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • Hearing08/30/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Joshua Sharfi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Joshua Sharfi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Joshua Sharfi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Joshua Sharfi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHWIMER MICHAEL EVAN