This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/24/2021 at 12:31:50 (UTC).

JOSHUA MARTIN, ET AL. VS OKLAND CONSTRUCTION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/27/2019 JOSHUA MARTIN filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against OKLAND CONSTRUCTION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are AMY D. HOGUE and KENNETH R. FREEMAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6477

  • Filing Date:

    12/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

AMY D. HOGUE

KENNETH R. FREEMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DITTEBRANDT EARL

MARTIN JOSHUA

GIERSCH SCOTT

JACOBS ROBERT

JACOBS HILARY

BAE HYEJUNG

CARLETON WILLIAM

TERRILL WILLIAM P.

RITLOP KEITH J.

CORLETT IAN

CARLETON SARAH

MARTIN AMANDA

MERRICK JEFFREY

ELM GARDENS LLC

OLLAR VERNON J.

CORLETT SANDRA

PETERSON MICHAEL E.

DITTEBRANDT JOY

Defendants and Cross Defendants

PERLITA GARDENS LLC

OKLAND CONSTRUCTION

Cross Plaintiff, Cross Defendant and Defendant

OKLAND CONSTRUCTION

26 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MALANGA GERALD B.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

KOEGEL BENJAMIN D.

BOGGS JOSIAH C. IV

KIRKPATRICK CHERYL ANN

CRONICAN WILLIAM PATRICK

Cross Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

BOGGS JOSIAH C. IV

KIRKPATRICK CHERYL ANN

KOEHLER WILLIAM DENNIS

MOOSHEKH ALAN

DALMORE JEAN A.

MORROW WILLIAM DEAN

ORLAND JAMES J.

 

Court Documents

Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

7/21/2020: Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

11/3/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Joint Status Conference Report - JOINT STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT

10/26/2021: Joint Status Conference Report - JOINT STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER CONTINUING HEARING DATE)

10/26/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER CONTINUING HEARING DATE)

Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

10/26/2021: Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

9/22/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

9/22/2021: Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

Notice - NOTICE OF NON-AVAILABILITY

8/24/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF NON-AVAILABILITY

Case Management Statement

9/13/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

9/13/2021: Case Management Statement

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

12/2/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

1/11/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

1/25/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Answer

2/2/2021: Answer

Notice of Entry of Judgment - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

2/3/2021: Notice of Entry of Judgment - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

Substitution of Attorney

2/22/2021: Substitution of Attorney

Case Management Statement

2/25/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

2/26/2021: Case Management Statement

78 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2022
  • Hearing03/03/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 7 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Post-Mediation Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Okland Construction (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • Docketat 11:00 AM in Department 7, Amy D. Hogue, Presiding; Post-Mediation Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • Docketat 4:11 PM in Department 7, Amy D. Hogue, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketClerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Continuing Hearing Date)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketJoint Status Conference Statement; Filed by Okland Construction (Cross-Complainant); Okland Construction (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 7, Amy D. Hogue, Presiding; Post-Mediation Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • Docketat 11:21 AM in Department 7, Amy D. Hogue, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketClerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
88 More Docket Entries
  • 01/16/2020
  • Docketat 2:09 PM in Department 7, Amy D. Hogue, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re Newly Assigned Case)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketInitial Status Conference Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Newly Assigned Case) of 01/16/2020, Initial Status Conference Order); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • Docketat 2:05 PM in Department 14, Kenneth R. Freeman, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re. Complex Determination;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re. Complex Determination;) of 01/06/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Joshua Martin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Joshua Martin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OKLAND CONSTRUCTION A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KOEHLER WILLIAM DENNIS

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MOOSHEKH ALAN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DALMORE JEAN A.