This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/27/2019 at 07:13:13 (UTC).

JOSHUA DAVIS HUBBARD ET AL VS BROCK DAVIS RIDENOUR ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/11/2018 a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle case was filed by JOSHUA DAVIS HUBBARD against BROCK DAVIS RIDENOUR in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5943

  • Filing Date:

    05/11/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner, Plaintiff and Guardian Ad Litem

HUBBARD JOSHUA DAVIS

Respondents and Defendants

RIDENOUR BROCK DAVIS

MINA RUDIMAR T.

DOES 1-100

Minor

HUBBARD FAITH ROSE

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF REJECTION - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

6/13/2018: NOTICE OF REJECTION - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM-CIVIL

6/13/2018: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM-CIVIL

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

6/28/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

BROCK DAVIS RIDENOUR'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT; ETC

7/12/2018: BROCK DAVIS RIDENOUR'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT; ETC

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

8/29/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

9/11/2018: NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

CIVIL DEPOSIT

9/11/2018: CIVIL DEPOSIT

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

9/11/2018: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

Demand for Jury Trial

11/2/2018: Demand for Jury Trial

Request for Dismissal

12/10/2018: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

5/28/2019: Request for Dismissal

COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURIES

5/11/2018: COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURIES

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/28/2019
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Joshua Davis Hubbard (Plaintiff); Faith Rose Hubbard (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Joshua Davis Hubbard (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • Demand for Jury Trial (and notice of jury fee deposit); Filed by Brock Davis Ridenour (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • CIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • Answer; Filed by Rudimar T. Mina (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • Notice; Filed by Rudimar T. Mina (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • Receipt; Filed by Rudimar T. Mina (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Joshua Davis Hubbard (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • BROCK DAVIS RIDENOUR'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • Answer; Filed by Brock Davis Ridenour (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Joshua Davis Hubbard (Plaintiff); Faith Rose Hubbard (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM-CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • Application ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • NOTICE OF REJECTION - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by Joshua Davis Hubbard (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURIES

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC705943    Hearing Date: December 18, 2019    Dept: 2

Hubbard, et al. v. Ridenour, et al.

SUBJECT TO HEARING AND PERSONAL APPEARANCE THEREON:

The parties having appeared (CRC 7.952(a)), and the court having reviewed and heard the Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim of a Minor, Faith Rose Hubbard, Age 14, the Court finds that the settlement is reasonable, and based thereon, approves and GRANTS the petition.

The court approves the following distribution of the settlement proceeds:

Attorney’s fees (25%)

$1,500.00

Medical expenses

1,500.00

Costs

0.00

Total fees and costs

$3,000.00

Total Settlement

$6,000.00

Less credits

-3,000.00

Net Settlement (for deposit into blocked account)

$3,000.00

THE COURT SETS AN OSC RE PROOF OF DEPOSIT ON APRIL 17, 2019 AT 8:30 AM. No appearance required if receipt filed.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.

Case Number: BC705943    Hearing Date: November 12, 2019    Dept: 2

Hubbard v. Ridenour, et al.

The court declines to approve the Expedited Petition for Compromise of Pending Action.

Counsel was ordered to obtain a signed order approving appointment of the Guardian ad Litem. The court’s file reflects that counsel submitted an Application for Appointment of Guardian ad Litem on 10/30/19, which has not yet been signed.

The court continues the hearing to 12/18/19 to permit the application to be processed.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.