Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/26/2021 at 15:23:53 (UTC).

JOSHUA CHAPLIN VS NYRVANA TECHNOLOGIES LLC.,, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/09/2020 JOSHUA CHAPLIN filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against NYRVANA TECHNOLOGIES LLC ,, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2981

  • Filing Date:

    11/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHAPLIN JOSHUA

Defendants

NYRVANA TECHNOLOGIES LLC. A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY CORPORATION

LOGAN ANDREW

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

MOSER JANA M.

 

Court Documents

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER ADDENDUM TO JOINT STIPULATION TO RETAIN JURISDICTION PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 664.6; [PROPOSED] ORDER

6/4/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER ADDENDUM TO JOINT STIPULATION TO RETAIN JURISDICTION PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 664.6; [PROPOSED] ORDER

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW TO CONFIRM RECEIPT OF PROPOSED STI...)

6/8/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW TO CONFIRM RECEIPT OF PROPOSED STI...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW TO CONFIRM RECEIPT OF PROPOSED STI...) OF 06/08/2021

6/8/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW TO CONFIRM RECEIPT OF PROPOSED STI...) OF 06/08/2021

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

12/18/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Personal Service

1/11/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

2/8/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Case Management Statement

2/8/2021: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

3/10/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE)

6/3/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/9/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

11/9/2020: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/9/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/9/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/12/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

11/18/2020: Proof of Personal Service

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/15/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 49; Order to Show Cause Re: (entry of default judgment) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 49; Non-Appearance Case Review (to confirm receipt of proposed default judgment packet (due6/1/21)) - Not Held - Clerical Error

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 49; Non-Appearance Case Review (to confirm receipt of proposed Stipulation and Order;) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review to confirm receipt of proposed Sti...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review to confirm receipt of proposed Sti...) of 06/08/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 49; Non-Appearance Case Review (to confirm receipt of proposed default judgment packet (due6/1/21)) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order (Addendum to Joint Stipulation to Retain Jurisdiction Pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure Section 664.6; [Proposed] Order); Filed by Joshua Chaplin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • Docketat 2:51 PM in Department 49; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Telephonic Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 49; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Joshua Chaplin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Joshua Chaplin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Joshua Chaplin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Joshua Chaplin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Joshua Chaplin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Joshua Chaplin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Joshua Chaplin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Joshua Chaplin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MOSER JANA