This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/11/2022 at 06:59:18 (UTC).

JOSHUA CANTER VS BRIAN JEFFEREY SACKS, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/29/2022 JOSHUA CANTER filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against BRIAN JEFFEREY SACKS,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4625

  • Filing Date:

    07/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CANTER JOSHUA

Defendants

SACKS BRIAN JEFFEREY AKA BRIAN J. SACKS

SACKS LINDSAY AKA LINDSAY BERGER SACKS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BERJIS MALOSACK

Defendant Attorney

YUN CHARLES C

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

7/29/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

7/29/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

7/29/2022: Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

7/29/2022: Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/29/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/29/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

7/29/2022: Complaint

Proof of Personal Service

8/12/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/12/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer

9/8/2022: Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/26/2024
  • Hearing07/26/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2024
  • Hearing01/26/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2024
  • Hearing01/12/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Brian Jefferey Sacks (Defendant); Lindsay Sacks (Defendant); As to: Joshua Canter (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Joshua Canter (Plaintiff); As to: Brian Jefferey Sacks (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 08/11/2022; Service Cost: 57.50; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Joshua Canter (Plaintiff); As to: Lindsay Sacks (Defendant); Service Date: 08/09/2022; Service Cost: 57.50; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 07/26/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Daniel M. Crowley in Department 28 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 01/12/2024 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/26/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Joshua Canter (Plaintiff); As to: Brian Jefferey Sacks (Defendant); Lindsay Sacks (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Joshua Canter (Plaintiff); As to: Brian Jefferey Sacks (Defendant); Lindsay Sacks (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Joshua Canter (Plaintiff); As to: Brian Jefferey Sacks (Defendant); Lindsay Sacks (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketSeventh Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer YUN CHARLES C. ESQ.