This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/07/2023 at 23:55:43 (UTC).

JOSHUA ANTONIO WILLIAMS, VS L.A. HYDRO-JET & ROOTER SERVICE, INC.

Case Summary

On 08/04/2022 JOSHUA ANTONIO WILLIAMS, filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against L A HYDRO-JET ROOTER SERVICE, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STUART M. RICE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5126

  • Filing Date:

    08/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STUART M. RICE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WILLIAMS JOSHUA ANTONIO

Defendant

L.A. HYDRO-JET & ROOTER SERVICE INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ALAVI AMIR TAHER

DIBA KASEY

Defendant Attorneys

CHEUNG ENOCH NATHAN

MULLIS TRISTAN A

 

Court Documents

Order - RULING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

3/30/2023: Order - RULING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER)

3/30/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER)

Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

3/30/2023: Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

Minute Order - (AMENDED)

3/20/2023: Minute Order - (AMENDED)

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE - KEVIN ANDREW ROLDAN CSR# 13463

3/20/2023: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE - KEVIN ANDREW ROLDAN CSR# 13463

Declaration - SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF FRANCES COLE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT L.A. HYDRO-JET & ROOTER SERVICE, INC.S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND REQUEST TO STAY LITIGATION

3/13/2023: Declaration - SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF FRANCES COLE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT L.A. HYDRO-JET & ROOTER SERVICE, INC.S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND REQUEST TO STAY LITIGATION

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE; HEARING ON DEFENDANT L.A. HYDRO-JE...)

2/23/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE; HEARING ON DEFENDANT L.A. HYDRO-JE...)

Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGMENT OF FOREIGN AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT L.A. HYDRO-JET & ROOTER SERVICE, INC.S REPLY BRIEF RE MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

2/15/2023: Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGMENT OF FOREIGN AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT L.A. HYDRO-JET & ROOTER SERVICE, INC.S REPLY BRIEF RE MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

Reply - REPLY BRIEF RE DEFENDANT L.A. HYDRO-JET & ROOTER SERVICE, INC.S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

2/15/2023: Reply - REPLY BRIEF RE DEFENDANT L.A. HYDRO-JET & ROOTER SERVICE, INC.S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

Memorandum of Points & Authorities - SUPPLEMENTAL POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND REQUEST TO STAY LITIGATION

2/9/2023: Memorandum of Points & Authorities - SUPPLEMENTAL POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND REQUEST TO STAY LITIGATION

Declaration - DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFF IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

2/8/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFF IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

Opposition - PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND REQUEST TO STAY LITIGATION:

2/8/2023: Opposition - PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND REQUEST TO STAY LITIGATION:

Request for Judicial Notice - REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT L.A. HYDRO-JET & ROOTER SERVICE, INC.'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND REQUEST TO STAY LITIGATION

1/30/2023: Request for Judicial Notice - REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT L.A. HYDRO-JET & ROOTER SERVICE, INC.'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND REQUEST TO STAY LITIGATION

Declaration - DECLARATION OF ENOCH N. CHEUNG IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT L.A. HYDRO-JET & ROOTER SERVICE, INC.'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND REQUEST TO STAY LITIGATION

1/30/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION OF ENOCH N. CHEUNG IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT L.A. HYDRO-JET & ROOTER SERVICE, INC.'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND REQUEST TO STAY LITIGATION

Motion to Compel Arbitration - DEFENDANT L.A. HYDRO-JET & ROOTER SERVICE, INC.'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND REQUEST FOR STAY LITIGATION

1/30/2023: Motion to Compel Arbitration - DEFENDANT L.A. HYDRO-JET & ROOTER SERVICE, INC.'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND REQUEST FOR STAY LITIGATION

Proof of Service by Mail

1/30/2023: Proof of Service by Mail

Declaration - DECLARATION OF FRANCES COLE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT L.A. HYDRO-JET & ROOTER SERVICE, INC.'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND REQUEST TO STAY LITIGATION

1/30/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION OF FRANCES COLE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT L.A. HYDRO-JET & ROOTER SERVICE, INC.'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND REQUEST TO STAY LITIGATION

Memorandum of Points & Authorities - MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT L.A. HYDRO-JET & ROOTER SERVICE, INC.'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND REQUEST TO STAY LITIGATION

1/30/2023: Memorandum of Points & Authorities - MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT L.A. HYDRO-JET & ROOTER SERVICE, INC.'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND REQUEST TO STAY LITIGATION

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/10/2023
  • Hearing10/10/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department 1 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2023
  • DocketRuling on Motion to Compel Arbitration; Signed and Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Ruling on Motion to Compel Arbitration: As To Parties:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2023
  • DocketStatus Conference Re: Arbitration scheduled for 10/10/2023 at 09:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2023
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Stay - Binding Arbitration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2023
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Joshua Antonio Williams, on 08/04/2022, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice, causes class claims

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2023
  • DocketClerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2023
  • DocketThe case is removed from the special status of: Class Action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Declaration of Joshua Antonio Williams in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion to Compel Arbitration and Request to Stay Litigation: Name Extension changed from of Plaintiff in support of Opposition to Motion to Compel Arbitration to of Joshua Antonio Williams in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion to Compel Arbitration and Request to Stay Litigation ; As To Parties:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
52 More Docket Entries
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Joshua Antonio Williams, (Plaintiff); As to: L.A. Hydro-Jet & Rooter Service, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Stuart M. Rice in Department 1 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Joshua Antonio Williams, (Plaintiff); As to: L.A. Hydro-Jet & Rooter Service, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Joshua Antonio Williams, (Plaintiff); As to: L.A. Hydro-Jet & Rooter Service, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Class Action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Provisionally Complex Case Type

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less