This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/26/2023 at 05:04:10 (UTC).

JOSHUA ANTONIO WILLIAMS, VS L.A. HYDRO-JET & ROOTER SERVICE, INC.

Case Summary

On 08/04/2022 JOSHUA ANTONIO WILLIAMS, filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against L A HYDRO-JET ROOTER SERVICE, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STUART M. RICE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5126

  • Filing Date:

    08/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STUART M. RICE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WILLIAMS JOSHUA ANTONIO

Defendant

L.A. HYDRO-JET & ROOTER SERVICE INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ALAVI AMIR TAHER

DIBA KASEY

Defendant Attorneys

CHEUNG ENOCH NATHAN

MULLIS TRISTAN A

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - (AMENDED)

3/20/2023: Minute Order - (AMENDED)

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE - KEVIN ANDREW ROLDAN CSR# 13463

3/20/2023: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE - KEVIN ANDREW ROLDAN CSR# 13463

Declaration - SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF FRANCES COLE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT L.A. HYDRO-JET & ROOTER SERVICE, INC.S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND REQUEST TO STAY LITIGATION

3/13/2023: Declaration - SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF FRANCES COLE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT L.A. HYDRO-JET & ROOTER SERVICE, INC.S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND REQUEST TO STAY LITIGATION

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE; HEARING ON DEFENDANT L.A. HYDRO-JE...)

2/23/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE; HEARING ON DEFENDANT L.A. HYDRO-JE...)

Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGMENT OF FOREIGN AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT L.A. HYDRO-JET & ROOTER SERVICE, INC.S REPLY BRIEF RE MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

2/15/2023: Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGMENT OF FOREIGN AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT L.A. HYDRO-JET & ROOTER SERVICE, INC.S REPLY BRIEF RE MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

Reply - REPLY BRIEF RE DEFENDANT L.A. HYDRO-JET & ROOTER SERVICE, INC.S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

2/15/2023: Reply - REPLY BRIEF RE DEFENDANT L.A. HYDRO-JET & ROOTER SERVICE, INC.S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

Memorandum of Points & Authorities - SUPPLEMENTAL POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND REQUEST TO STAY LITIGATION

2/9/2023: Memorandum of Points & Authorities - SUPPLEMENTAL POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND REQUEST TO STAY LITIGATION

Declaration - DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFF IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

2/8/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFF IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

Opposition - PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND REQUEST TO STAY LITIGATION:

2/8/2023: Opposition - PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND REQUEST TO STAY LITIGATION:

Request for Judicial Notice - REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT L.A. HYDRO-JET & ROOTER SERVICE, INC.'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND REQUEST TO STAY LITIGATION

1/30/2023: Request for Judicial Notice - REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT L.A. HYDRO-JET & ROOTER SERVICE, INC.'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND REQUEST TO STAY LITIGATION

Declaration - DECLARATION OF ENOCH N. CHEUNG IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT L.A. HYDRO-JET & ROOTER SERVICE, INC.'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND REQUEST TO STAY LITIGATION

1/30/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION OF ENOCH N. CHEUNG IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT L.A. HYDRO-JET & ROOTER SERVICE, INC.'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND REQUEST TO STAY LITIGATION

Motion to Compel Arbitration - DEFENDANT L.A. HYDRO-JET & ROOTER SERVICE, INC.'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND REQUEST FOR STAY LITIGATION

1/30/2023: Motion to Compel Arbitration - DEFENDANT L.A. HYDRO-JET & ROOTER SERVICE, INC.'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND REQUEST FOR STAY LITIGATION

Proof of Service by Mail

1/30/2023: Proof of Service by Mail

Declaration - DECLARATION OF FRANCES COLE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT L.A. HYDRO-JET & ROOTER SERVICE, INC.'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND REQUEST TO STAY LITIGATION

1/30/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION OF FRANCES COLE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT L.A. HYDRO-JET & ROOTER SERVICE, INC.'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND REQUEST TO STAY LITIGATION

Memorandum of Points & Authorities - MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT L.A. HYDRO-JET & ROOTER SERVICE, INC.'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND REQUEST TO STAY LITIGATION

1/30/2023: Memorandum of Points & Authorities - MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT L.A. HYDRO-JET & ROOTER SERVICE, INC.'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND REQUEST TO STAY LITIGATION

Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGMENT OF FOREIGN AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT L.A. HYDRO-JET & ROOTER SERVICE, INC.'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND REQUEST TO STAY LITIGATION

1/30/2023: Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGMENT OF FOREIGN AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT L.A. HYDRO-JET & ROOTER SERVICE, INC.'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND REQUEST TO STAY LITIGATION

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

11/17/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Initial Status Conference Report

11/10/2022: Initial Status Conference Report

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/20/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Declaration of Joshua Antonio Williams in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion to Compel Arbitration and Request to Stay Litigation: Name Extension changed from of Plaintiff in support of Opposition to Motion to Compel Arbitration to of Joshua Antonio Williams in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion to Compel Arbitration and Request to Stay Litigation ; As To Parties:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion to Compel Arbitration and Request to Stay Litigation; Declaration of Amir T. Alavi in Support Thereof: Exact Name changed from Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion to Compel Arbitration and Request to Stay Litigation: to Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion to Compel Arbitration and Request to Stay Litigation; Declaration of Amir T. Alavi in Support Thereof ; As To Parties:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Plaintiff's Supplemental Points and Authorities in Support of Opposition to Motion to Compel Arbitration and Request to Stay Litigation; Declaration of Amir T. Alavi in Support Thereof: Exact Name changed from Plaintiff's Supplemental Points and Authorities in Support Opposition to Motion to Compel Arbitration and Request to Stay Litigation to Plaintiff's Supplemental Points and Authorities in Support of Opposition to Motion to Compel Arbitration and Request to Stay Litigation; Declaration of Amir T. Alavi in Support Thereof ; As To Parties:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Plaintiff's Supplemental Points and Authorities in Support Opposition to Motion to Compel Arbitration and Request to Stay Litigation: Exact Name changed from Supplemental Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration and Request to Stay Litigation to Plaintiff's Supplemental Points and Authorities in Support Opposition to Motion to Compel Arbitration and Request to Stay Litigation ; As To Parties:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Minute Order (Hearing on Defendant L.A. Hydro-Jet & Rooter Service, Inc.'s ...): Status Date changed from 03/20/2023 to 03/20/2023 ; Name Extension changed from (Hearing on Defendant L.A. Hydro-Jet & Rooter Service, Inc.'s ...) to (Hearing on Defendant L.A. Hydro-Jet & Rooter Service, Inc.'s ...) ; As To Parties:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • DocketOrder Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - Kevin Andrew Roldan CSR# 13463; Signed and Filed by: Joshua Antonio Williams, (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - Kevin Andrew Roldan CSR# 13463: As To Parties:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • DocketAmended Minute Order (Hearing on Defendant L.A. Hydro-Jet & Rooter Service, Inc.'s ...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration by Defendant L.A. Hydro-Jet & Rooter Service, Inc. scheduled for 03/20/2023 at 01:45 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 1 updated: Result Date to 03/20/2023; Result Type to Held - Taken under Submission

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • DocketInitial Status Conference scheduled for 03/20/2023 at 01:45 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 1 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court on 03/20/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
43 More Docket Entries
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Joshua Antonio Williams, (Plaintiff); As to: L.A. Hydro-Jet & Rooter Service, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Stuart M. Rice in Department 1 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Joshua Antonio Williams, (Plaintiff); As to: L.A. Hydro-Jet & Rooter Service, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Joshua Antonio Williams, (Plaintiff); As to: L.A. Hydro-Jet & Rooter Service, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Class Action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Provisionally Complex Case Type

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less