This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/03/2023 at 04:04:53 (UTC).

JOSH DE MICHAEL REZAEE VS LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/10/2023 JOSH DE MICHAEL REZAEE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3028

  • Filing Date:

    02/10/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

REZAEE JOSH DE MICHAEL

Defendants

LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY

WHITTAKER ERRINGTON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BELLOSO DULCE C.

CHAMPION KIA

 

Court Documents

Complaint

2/10/2023: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/10/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/10/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

2/10/2023: Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

Unknown - EIGHTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

2/10/2023: Unknown - EIGHTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

2/10/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

2/10/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2025
  • Hearing02/07/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2024
  • Hearing08/09/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2024
  • Hearing07/26/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Josh de Michael Rezaee (Plaintiff); As to: Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transportation Authority (Defendant); Errington Whittaker (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 02/07/2025 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 29 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Josh de Michael Rezaee (Plaintiff); As to: Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transportation Authority (Defendant); Errington Whittaker (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Josh de Michael Rezaee (Plaintiff); As to: Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transportation Authority (Defendant); Errington Whittaker (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • DocketEighth Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 07/26/2024 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/09/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less