This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/30/2020 at 01:13:17 (UTC).

JOSH BOLLIGER VS IKEA NORTH AMERICA SERVICES, LLC, DBA IKEA, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY DOING BUSINESS IN THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Case Summary

On 11/25/2019 JOSH BOLLIGER filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against IKEA NORTH AMERICA SERVICES, LLC, DBA IKEA, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY DOING BUSINESS IN THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2362

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BOLLIGER JOSH

Defendant

IKEA NORTH AMERICA SERVICES LLC. DBA IKEA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KRAMER MATTHEW THOMAS

Defendant Attorney

JAMES JOHNNIE A.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

11/25/2019: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/25/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/25/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/25/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/8/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Answer

1/7/2020: Answer

Request for Dismissal

4/27/2020: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

4/16/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/16/2020

4/16/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/16/2020

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/28/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 24; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Josh Bolliger (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 24; Court Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/16/2020); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Ikea North America Services, LLC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Josh Bolliger (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Josh Bolliger (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Josh Bolliger (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where IKEA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JAMES JOHNNIE A.